Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Wells Fago Bank NA Plaintiff vs. Nicky A Yancey, et al Defendant
On January 12, 2018 a real prop homestead res fore - >$50k - <$250,000 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 12, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Real Prop Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Active
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a mortgage foreclosure complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A., as trustee for Carrington Mortgage Loan Trust, Series 2006-NC2 Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, against various defendants including Nicky A. Yancey, the un…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Motion to Vacate Final Judgment
Date: Mar 04, 2019Order Placing Case on Reopened Inactive Status
Date: Sep 25, 2018Order Vacating Sale
Date: Sep 25, 2018Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: Sep 18, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Sep 13, 2018Motion to Vacate
Date: Sep 12, 2018Suggestion of Bankruptcy
Date: Sep 12, 2018Bid Sheet
Date: Sep 12, 2018Certificate of Sale
Date: Sep 12, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: Sep 07, 2018Notice of Withdrawal
Date: Sep 06, 2018Motion to Cancel Foreclosure Sale
Date: Sep 05, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Sep 05, 2018Proof of Publication
Date: Aug 31, 2018Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney
Date: Aug 08, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: Aug 06, 2018Final Disposition Form
Date: Aug 06, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Jul 05, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: Jun 22, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: Jun 22, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: Jun 12, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: Jun 05, 2018Default
Date: Apr 24, 2018Affidavit
Date: Apr 24, 2018Motion for Default
Date: Apr 24, 2018Proof of Publication
Date: Apr 02, 2018Order Vacating Default
Date: Mar 20, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: Mar 19, 2018Answer
Date: Mar 19, 2018Stipulation
Date: Mar 19, 2018Notice of Action
Date: Mar 15, 2018Certificate
Date: Mar 15, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: Mar 02, 2018Affidavit of Diligent Search
Date: Mar 02, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: Mar 02, 2018Amended Affidavit of Service
Date: Feb 21, 2018Default
Date: Feb 21, 2018Amended Affidavit of Service
Date: Feb 21, 2018Motion for Default
Date: Feb 21, 2018Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic
Date: Feb 21, 2018Amended Affidavit of Service
Date: Feb 21, 2018Amended Affidavit of Service
Date: Feb 21, 2018Amended Affidavit of Service
Date: Feb 21, 2018Amended Affidavit of Service
Date: Feb 21, 2018Affidavit of Service
Date: Feb 17, 2018Affidavit of Service
Date: Feb 17, 2018Affidavit of Service
Date: Feb 17, 2018Affidavit of Service
Date: Feb 17, 2018Affidavit of Service
Date: Feb 17, 2018Affidavit of Service
Date: Feb 17, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: Feb 13, 2018Answer
Date: Jan 26, 2018eSummons Not Issued - Atty advised
Date: Jan 12, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 12, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 12, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 12, 2018Certificate
Date: Jan 12, 2018Lis Pendens
Date: Jan 12, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 12, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 12, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 12, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 12, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 12, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 12, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Re-open Fee Payor: LENDER LEGAL SERVICES LLC ; Userid: CTS-pdailey ; Receipt: 20191YE1P000369; ;Amount: $50.00 |
|
March 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Comment: Original Note returned to Lender Legal Service via FEDX 7746 3101 7425 |
|
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Reopen Case Billed Party: Attorney Vamvas, Anthony, ESQ. |
|
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Vacate Final Judgment Dismiss Action, Discharge Lis Pendens and Return OriginalsParty: Plaintiff Wells Fago Bank NA |
|
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE CREATED FOR ORGINAL DOCS |
|
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Placing Case on Reopened Inactive Status | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Vacating Sale | |
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Notice of Hearing September 25, 2018 at 1:30 PM RM WW14160 |
|
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale & Proof of Publication Emailed | |
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale & Proof of Publication Mailed | |
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Vacate SEPTEMBER 11, 2018 FORECLOSURE SALEParty: Plaintiff Wells Fago Bank NA |
|
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Suggestion of Bankruptcy 18-21062-RBRParty: Defendant Yancey, Nicky A |
|
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet | |
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale | |
September 11, 2018 | hearing | Foreclosure Sale | |
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Foreclosure Sale Fee Payor: Anas Iqbal ; Userid: CTS- ; Receipt: 20181RA1A003903; ;Amount: $70.00 |
|
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal Party: Plaintiff Wells Fago Bank NA |
|
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Cancel Foreclosure Sale Party: Plaintiff Wells Fago Bank NA |
|
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication September 11, 2018 |
|
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE CREATED FOR ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS |
|
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Electronic Sale Fee Paid Payor: LENDER LEGAL SERVICES, LLC ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A111655; ;Amount: $60.00 |
|
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Sale to be Issued by Attorney | |
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney 9/11/18Party: Plaintiff Wells Fago Bank NA |
|
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing original noteParty: Plaintiff Wells Fago Bank NA |
|
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
July 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Affidavit of Amounts Due and OwingParty: Plaintiff Wells Fago Bank NA |
|
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Party: Plaintiff Wells Fago Bank NA |
|
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Plaintiff' s Affidavit as to Reasonable Attorney's Fees . Affidavit of Attorney's Fees . Affidvit of Court CostsParty: Plaintiff Wells Fago Bank NA |
|
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
April 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Default againstParty: Defendant Greene, Danita |
|
April 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit OF INABILITY TO DETERMINE MILITARY STATUS |
|
April 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Party: Plaintiff Wells Fago Bank NA |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication TO: DANITA GREENE ON OR BEFORE 30 DAYS AFTER 3/22/18 |
|
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Vacating Default Agreed Order Granting Stipulation to Vacate Default Against Deft State of Florida on 2/22/18 |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Party: Defendant State of Florida |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer Party: Defendant State of Florida |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation TO VACATE DEFAULTParty: Plaintiff Wells Fago Bank NA |
|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Action TO : DANITA GREENE |
|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate REGARDING MAILING OF NOTICES PURSUANT TO SECTION 49.12 F.S |
|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Copy to Daily Business Review Party: Defendant Greene, Danita |
|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Copies Mailed Party: Defendant Greene, Danita |
|
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Diligent Search | |
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved Party: Defendant Greene, Danita |
|
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Affidavit of Service (Unserved) / Unknown Tenant #2 |
|
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Default NICKY A. YANCEY, UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF NICKY A. YANCEY NKA ROSALIND YVETTE YANCEY, and STATE OF FLORIDA |
|
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Affidavit of Service 1/25/2018Party: Defendant Yancey, Nicky A |
|
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion for Default | |
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic | |
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Affidavit of Service 01/25/18 / UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF NICKY A.YANCEY |
|
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Affidavit of Service (Unserved) / Unknown Tenant #1 |
|
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Affidavit of Service 1/24/2018Party: Defendant Willow Lakes Homeowners Association Inc |
|
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Affidavit of Service 1/24/2018Party: Defendant Clerk of Circuit Court in and for Broward County Fl |
|
February 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service 1/25/2018 at 01:55 PM |
|
February 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service 1/24/2018 at 12:20 PMParty: Defendant State of Florida |
|
February 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service 1/24/2018 at 12:10 PMParty: Defendant Clerk of Circuit Court in and for Broward County Fl |
|
February 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service 1/25/2018 * 01:55 PM |
|
February 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service 1/25/2018 at 01:55 PMParty: Defendant Yancey, Nicky A |
|
February 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service 1/24/2018 * 11:47 AMParty: Defendant Willow Lakes Homeowners Association Inc |
|
February 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service 1/25/2018 at 01:55 PM |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint CLERK OF COURT'S ANSWER TO VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINTParty: Defendant Clerk of Circuit Court in and for Broward County Fl |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer Party: Defendant Willow Lakes Homeowners Association Inc |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Not Issued - Atty advised Defendant name needs to match complaint |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Unknown Tenant 2 |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Willow Lakes Homeowner's Association |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Nicky A. Yancey |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate OF NOTE POSSESSIONParty: Plaintiff Wells Fago Bank NA |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Lis Pendens Fld & Rec |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Danita Greene |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSUREParty: Plaintiff Wells Fago Bank NA |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Unknown Tenant 1 |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Unknown Spouse of Nicky A. Yancey |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance State of Florida |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: ANTHONY DEMETRIUS VAMVAS IV ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A005813; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Defendant Count > than 5 Payor: ANTHONY DEMETRIUS VAMVAS IV ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A005813; ;Amount: $7.50 |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid Payor: ANTHONY DEMETRIUS VAMVAS IV ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A005813; ;Amount: $906.00 |