Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Robert Christner Plaintiff vs. Security National Insurance Company Defendant
On January 12, 2018 an auto negligence case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Bowman, John B. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 12, 2018
Last Refreshed
October 07, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Auto Negligence
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Active
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Robert Christner against Security National Insurance Company. The complaint states that the plaintiff is seeking damages in excess of $15,000. The plaintiff alleges that they were involved in a motor vehicle accident wi…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: Mar 28, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: Mar 01, 2022Response to Motion
Date: Mar 01, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: Jan 13, 2022Response
Date: Dec 07, 2021Motion for Directed Verdict
Date: Nov 29, 2021Motion for Leave
Date: Nov 29, 2021Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: Nov 15, 2021Order
Date: Nov 10, 2021Proposed Jury Instructions
Date: Nov 10, 2021Jury Questions
Date: Nov 09, 2021Jury Instructions
Date: Nov 09, 2021Verdict
Date: Nov 09, 2021Exhibits
Date: Nov 09, 2021Clerks Minutes/Jury Sworn
Date: Nov 09, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: Nov 09, 2021Order Extending Time
Date: Jun 08, 2020Response to Request to Produce
Date: Jun 05, 2020Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: May 26, 2020Request to Produce
Date: May 06, 2020Interrogatories
Date: May 06, 2020Motion for Continuance
Date: Jan 28, 2020Order Granting Motion
Date: Jan 28, 2020Joint Pre-Trial Stipulation
Date: Jan 16, 2020Objection
Date: Jan 13, 2020Memorandum in Opposition
Date: Dec 06, 2019Response to Request to Produce
Date: Oct 04, 2019Motion for Protective Order
Date: Sep 26, 2019Motion for Protective Order
Date: Sep 26, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: Sep 24, 2019Request for Production
Date: Sep 19, 2019Response to Request to Produce
Date: Apr 29, 2019Mediation Report
Date: Dec 21, 2018Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: Dec 18, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: Nov 21, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: Jul 13, 2018Order
Date: Jul 09, 2018Order Granting Motion
Date: May 14, 2018Motion
Date: May 14, 2018Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: May 11, 2018Motion
Date: Apr 26, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: Mar 08, 2018Request for Copies
Date: Mar 01, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Feb 28, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: Feb 25, 2018Motion to Bifurcate
Date: Feb 25, 2018Interrogatories
Date: Feb 25, 2018Request to Produce
Date: Feb 25, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 12, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Affidavit | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response to Motion FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTSParty: Plaintiff Christner, Robert |
|
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE VERDICT. MOTION FOR RENEWED DIRECTED VERDICT, MOTION FOR JUDGMET NON OBSTANTE VERDICTO OR MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVIEW JURORSParty: Defendant Security National Insurance Company |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Directed Verdict AND RENEWED MOTION FOR DIRECTED VERDICT. MOTION FOR JUDGMENT NON OBSTANTE VERDICTO AND, ALTERNATIVEL, MOTION FOR NEW TRIALParty: Plaintiff Christner, Robert |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Leave TO INTERVIEW JURORSParty: Plaintiff Christner, Robert |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Attorney Fees Party: Defendant Security National Insurance Company |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order All evidence, for the above styled case, shall remain in the courtroom |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Jury Instructions Party: Plaintiff Christner, Robert |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Questions | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Instructions | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Verdict | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibits Party: Defendant Security National Insurance Company |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Minutes/Jury Sworn Party: Plaintiff Christner, Robert Defendant Security National Insurance Company |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Case Information SheetParty: Defendant Security National Insurance Company |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Party: Plaintiff Christner, Robert |
|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Jury Instructions Party: Plaintiff Christner, Robert |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Conflict Party: Plaintiff Christner, Robert |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call-Order Resetting Trial Calendar Call: 10-29-2021 |
|
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Conflict | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call-Order Resetting Trial Calendar Call: 09-10-2021 |
|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Conflict | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Conflict Party: Plaintiff Christner, Robert |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call-Order Resetting Trial Calendar Call will be 07-16-2021 10:00 AM |
|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Video Deposition ROBERT CHRISTNER August 21, 2020 at 10:30 AM |
|
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Extending Time | |
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Response to Request to Produce | |
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Enlargement of Time Party: Plaintiff Christner, Robert |
|
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline CALENDAR CALL: 11-13-2020 at 10:00 AM |
|
May 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Request to Produce | |
May 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Interrogatories | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance PLAINTIFF'SParty: Plaintiff Christner, Robert |
|
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion PL's Motion for Continuance |
|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent TO RELY ON AFFADAVIT OF RECORDS CUSTODIAN FOR NORTH BROWARD MEDICAL CENTERParty: Defendant Security National Insurance Company |
|
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Joint Pre-Trial Stipulation Party: Plaintiff Christner, Robert Defendant Security National Insurance Company |
|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine DEFENDANT SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY'SParty: Defendant Security National Insurance Company |
|
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Objection TO DEFENDANT'S TRIAL EXHIBIT LISTParty: Plaintiff Christner, Robert |
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Conflict Party: Plaintiff Christner, Robert |
|
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Memorandum in Opposition | |
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Deposition | |
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Affidavit | |
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Final Judgment Party: Defendant Security National Insurance Company |
|
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Final Judgment Party: Defendant Security National Insurance Company |
|
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Video Deposition DEPUTY WILLIAM BROWNING Badge#14263 |
|
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Response to Request to Produce | |
September 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Protective Order DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDERParty: Defendant Security National Insurance Company |
|
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Protective Order Party: Defendant Security National Insurance Company |
|
September 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Party: Plaintiff Christner, Robert |
|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Catalog | |
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Video Deposition August 21, 2019 OFFICER WILLIAM BROWNING 11:30 AM |
|
May 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial CALENDAR CALL: 01-17-2020 |
|
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Response to Request to Produce | |
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Conflict Party: Plaintiff Christner, Robert |
|
February 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Witness & Exhibit List Party: Defendant Security National Insurance Company |
|
February 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice OF DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONParty: Defendant Security National Insurance Company |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Disclosure of Expert Witness | |
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
October 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Video Deposition November 8, 2018 ( See Pleading ) |
|
October 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Firm Name Change Party: Defendant Security National Insurance Company |
|
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement Party: Defendant Security National Insurance Company |
|
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Discovery Party: Defendant Security National Insurance Company |
|
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial CALENDER CALL: 02-22-2019 |
|
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Order | |
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
May 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice for/of Trial | |
May 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel DEPOSITION DATES FROM PLAINTIFFParty: Defendant Security National Insurance Company |
|
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY |
|
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion | |
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Leave to Amend Party: Defendant Security National Insurance Company |
|
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR RELIEF FROM TECHNICAL ADMISSIONSParty: Plaintiff Christner, Robert |
|
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Reply to Affirmative Defenses | |
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Plaintiff Christner, Robert |
|
February 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Demand for Jury Trial Party: Defendant Security National Insurance Company |
|
February 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Party: Defendant Security National Insurance Company |
|
February 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESSParty: Defendant Security National Insurance Company |
|
February 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Bifurcate Party: Defendant Security National Insurance Company |
|
February 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Interrogatories Party: Defendant Security National Insurance Company |
|
February 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request to Produce Party: Defendant Security National Insurance Company |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses RICHARD B. DOYLE, JRParty: Plaintiff Christner, Robert |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Christner, Robert |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance RICHARD B. DOYLE, JRParty: Plaintiff Christner, Robert |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: RICHARD BARRON DOYLE JR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A005814; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: RICHARD BARRON DOYLE JR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A005814; ;Amount: $10.00 |