Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Ciollins Asset Group LLC Plaintiff vs. Lisa Durow Defendant
On January 12, 2018 contract and indebtedness case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Phillips, Carol-Lisa presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 12, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Judge
Hon. Phillips, Carol-Lisa
Category
Contract and Indebtedness
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Bankruptcy
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by COLLINS ASSET GROUP, LLC against LISA DUROW. The plaintiff, COLLINS ASSET GROUP, LLC, is a Delaware Limited Liability Company with a principal place of business in Texas. The defendant, LISA DUROW, resides in Broward Co…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Suggestion of Bankruptcy
Date: Jan 24, 2019Motion for Default
Date: Dec 20, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: Mar 23, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 12, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 12, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 12, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Suggestion of Bankruptcy Case No.: 19-10988-JKO |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Party: Plaintiff Ciollins Asset Group LLC |
|
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 19th day of March, 2018 at 7:05 pmParty: Defendant Durow, Lisa |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Ciollins Asset Group LLC |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance LISA DUROW |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: THOMAS L AVRUTIS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A005744; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: THOMAS L AVRUTIS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A005744; ;Amount: $10.00 |