Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Anthony Rodriguez, et al Plaintiff vs. Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company Defendant
On January 08, 2018 contract and indebtedness case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 08, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Contract and Indebtedness
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Dismissal
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I BREACH OF CONTRACT
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Anthony Rodriguez and Reina Rodriguez against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The plaintiffs are residents of Broward County, Florida, while the defendant is an insurance company doing business in the s…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Joint Stipulation
Date: Aug 29, 2018Motion to Enforce
Date: Aug 23, 2018Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: Jul 30, 2018Consent to Substitution of Counsel
Date: Jul 30, 2018Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: Jul 30, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Feb 16, 2018Request for Production
Date: Feb 02, 2018Notice of Filing Interrogs
Date: Feb 02, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Jan 31, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: Jan 31, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Jan 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 08, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 08, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 08, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Joint Stipulation FOR FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WZTH PREJUDIQEParty: Plaintiff Rodriguez, Anthony Plaintiff Rodriguez, Reina Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Enforce Party: Plaintiff Rodriguez, Anthony Plaintiff Rodriguez, Reina |
|
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Order for Substitution of Counsel | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Consent to Substitution of Counsel Party: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel Melissa V. Jordon, Esquire Florida Bar No.: 123576Party: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO PENDING COMPLAINTParty: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Interrogs | |
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Party: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSParty: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: RAMON J DIEGO ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A003337; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: RAMON J DIEGO ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A003337; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event | eSummons Issuance | |
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint (eFiled) | |
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet |