Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Ryan B Lelchuk, et al Plaintiff vs. LM General Insurance Company Defendant
On January 08, 2018 an auto negligence case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Bowman, John B. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 08, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Auto Negligence
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Closed
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I- RYAN B, LELCHUK.
COUNT Il— CONSORTIUM — TRACEY N. GREENE LELCHUK
COUNT Ill —- TRACEY N. GREENE LELCHUK
COUNT IV — CONSORTIUM - RYAN B. LELCHUK
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by the Plaintiffs, Ryan B. Lelchuk and Tracey N. Greene Lelchuk, against the Defendant, LM General Insurance Company. The Plaintiffs are residents of Oakland Park, Broward County, Florida. The Defendant is a foreign corpor…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Mediation Report
Date: Nov 01, 2019Notice of Mediation
Date: Oct 24, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: Sep 16, 2019Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: Sep 10, 2019Notice of Appearance
Date: Aug 30, 2019Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: Aug 30, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: Aug 07, 2019Request
Date: Jul 16, 2019Notice of Service
Date: Jul 03, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Apr 18, 2019Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Mar 28, 2019Response to Request for Production
Date: Mar 28, 2019Response to Request for Admissions
Date: Mar 28, 2019Response
Date: Jan 28, 2019Notice of Service
Date: Jan 24, 2019Notice of Readiness for Trial
Date: Jan 17, 2019Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: Jan 17, 2019Answer to Amended Complaint
Date: Jan 14, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: Jan 09, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Dec 28, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Dec 07, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: Jul 30, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Jul 30, 2018Notice of Disclosure
Date: Jan 16, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: Jan 16, 2018Notice of Service
Date: Jan 15, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: Jan 15, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 08, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 08, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 08, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel PLAINTIFFS TO ANSWER FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES, TO COMPLY WITH FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST OR PRODUCTION, AND TO PROVIDE THEIR FULLY EXECUTED VERIFICATION PAGESParty: Defendant LM General Insurance Company |
|
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel ANDREA STRUDWICK (FBN:98104) COUNSEL FOR THE DEFENDANTParty: Defendant LM General Insurance Company |
|
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant LM General Insurance Company |
|
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Party: Defendant LM General Insurance Company |
|
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
July 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Request | |
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories | |
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories | |
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Response TO PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF TRIAL READINESSParty: Defendant LM General Insurance Company |
|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Readiness for Trial | |
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Reply to Affirmative Defenses | |
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Answer to Amended Complaint Party: Defendant LM General Insurance Company |
|
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint Party: Plaintiff Lelchuk, Ryan B Plaintiff Greene Lelchuk, Tracey N |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses AMENDED NOTICE OF COMPLIANCEParty: Defendant LM General Insurance Company |
|
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant LM General Insurance Company |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Disclosure | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint Party: Defendant LM General Insurance Company |
|
January 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
January 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses | |
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: NICHOLAS A. ZACHAREWSKI ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A003202; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: NICHOLAS A. ZACHAREWSKI ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A003202; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIALParty: Plaintiff Lelchuk, Ryan B Plaintiff Greene Lelchuk, Tracey N |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance To: LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY |