Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Timothy Wildrick Plaintiff vs. Holy Cross Hospital, et al Defendant
On January 08, 2018 an extension of time case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Bowman, John B. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 08, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Extension of Time
Practice Area
Administrative
Matter Type
Licensing
Status
Closed
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a unilateral petition for an automatic extension of the statute of limitations filed by the plaintiff, Timothy Wildrick, against Holy Cross Hospital, Che Trinity d/b/a Holy Cross Medical Group, and Dr. Ali Ghods Jourabchi. The p…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Nov 28, 2018Petition (eFiled)
Date: Jan 08, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 08, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Management Conference | |
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Petition (eFiled) For automatic exension of statute of limitations pursuant to section |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Extension of Time Fee Payor: TAMATHA S ALVAREZ ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A003080; ;Amount: $43.00 |