Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Doris Avila, et al Plaintiff vs. Southern Oak Insurance Company Defendant
On January 05, 2018 contract and indebtedness case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Phillips, Carol-Lisa presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 05, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Judge
Hon. Phillips, Carol-Lisa
Category
Contract and Indebtedness
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Closed
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I BREACH OF CONTRACT
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Dorys Avila and John Avila against Southern Oak Insurance Company. The plaintiffs are residents of Broward County, Florida, while the defendant is a Florida corporation conducting business in the same county. The lawsui…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: Apr 25, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: Jun 20, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: Jun 20, 2018Amended Request to Produce
Date: Jun 20, 2018Interrogatories
Date: Jun 20, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: May 23, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 05, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 05, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 05, 2018Request to Produce
Date: Jan 05, 2018Interrogatories
Date: Jan 05, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing | |
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: THOMAS J MORGAN JR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A086188; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance ISSUED ON: SOUTHERN OAK INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved REJECTED PROCESS NON-SERVED UNABLE TO SERVE |
|
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Amended Request to Produce | |
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Interrogatories | |
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Admissions | |
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: THOMAS J MORGAN JR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A002586; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: THOMAS J MORGAN JR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A002586; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Avila, Doris Plaintiff Avila, John |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance SOUTHERN FIDELITY PROPERTY & CASUALTY, INC |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request to Produce DEFENDANTParty: Plaintiff Avila, Doris Plaintiff Avila, John |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Interrogatories DEFENDANTParty: Plaintiff Avila, Doris Plaintiff Avila, John |