Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Daniel Titzer, et al Plaintiff vs. Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company Defendant
On January 05, 2018 an other - insurance claim case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Frink, Keathan B. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 05, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Other - Insurance Claim
Practice Area
Insurance
Matter Type
Insurance Coverage
Status
Settlement
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I - BREACH OF CONTRACT
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Daniel Titzer and Christina Titzer against Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The plaintiffs are seeking damages in excess of $15,000, exclusive of attorneys' fees, costs, and prejudgment interest. The plai…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Notice of Settlement
Date: Mar 20, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: Feb 26, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Jan 30, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: Jan 29, 2018Request for Production
Date: Jan 29, 2018Notice of Propounding Interrogatories
Date: Jan 29, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: Jan 29, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Jan 29, 2018Request for Production
Date: Jan 05, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: Jan 05, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 05, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 05, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 05, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Defendant Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Enlargement of Time OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERYParty: Defendant Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINTParty: Defendant Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Party: Defendant Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Party: Defendant Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Propounding Interrogatories Party: Defendant Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Unavailability Party: Defendant Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Heritage Property and Casualty Insurance CompanyParty: Plaintiff Titzer, Daniel Plaintiff Titzer, Christina |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Valorie S ChavinParty: Plaintiff Titzer, Daniel Plaintiff Titzer, Christina |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Heritage Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint (eFiled) | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: VALORIE S CHAVIN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A002501; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: VALORIE S CHAVIN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A002501; ;Amount: $10.00 |