Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Cesar A. Duran, Jr. Plaintiff vs. American Security Insurance Company Defendant
On January 05, 2018 contract and indebtedness case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 05, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
, Jr.;Category
Contract and Indebtedness
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Closed
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Cesar A. Duran Jr. against American Security Insurance Company. The plaintiff alleges breach of contract by the defendant, arising from a claim for insurance proceeds. The plaintiff had an insurance policy with the defe…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Joint Stipulation
Date: Dec 05, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: Aug 22, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Aug 22, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: Aug 22, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Aug 14, 2018Notice of Interrogatories
Date: Jul 09, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: Jul 09, 2018Request for Production
Date: Jul 09, 2018Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Apr 18, 2018Request for Production
Date: Mar 08, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: Mar 08, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Feb 26, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 24, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 05, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 05, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Joint Stipulation Party: Plaintiff Duran, Jr\., Cesar A. |
|
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant American Security Insurance Company |
|
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatories Party: Plaintiff Duran, Jr\., Cesar A. |
|
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Party: Plaintiff Duran, Jr\., Cesar A. |
|
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Party: Plaintiff Duran, Jr\., Cesar A. |
|
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINTParty: Defendant American Security Insurance Company |
|
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant American Security Insurance Company |
|
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: MICHAEL A PUCHADES ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A011847; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance American Security Insurance Company |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) And Demand for Jury TrailParty: Plaintiff Duran, Cesar A |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: MICHAEL A PUCHADES ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A002487; ;Amount: $401.00 |