Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
U.S. BANK TRUST N.A. AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST Plaintiff vs. Francine Gomez, et al Defendant
On January 05, 2018 a real prop non-homestead res fore - >$50k - <$250,000 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 05, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Real Prop Non-Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Judgment of Foreclosure
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I - MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a verified complaint for foreclosure of a mortgage on real property located in Broward County, Florida. The plaintiff, Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, alleges that the defendants, Ismel Gomez and Francine Gomez, executed a promi…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: May 04, 2020Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Mar 24, 2020Motion to Withdraw
Date: Mar 03, 2020Final Disposition Form
Date: Mar 02, 2020Case Management Conference Order
Date: Feb 25, 2020Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Feb 25, 2020Certificate of Service
Date: Jan 13, 2020Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Jan 08, 2020Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Jan 08, 2020Certificate of Service
Date: Nov 22, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Nov 18, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Nov 18, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: Nov 04, 2019Certificate of Service
Date: Oct 28, 2019Motion to Withdraw
Date: Oct 17, 2019Motion to Withdraw
Date: Oct 17, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Sep 24, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Sep 24, 2019Certificate of Service
Date: Aug 22, 2019Certificate
Date: Aug 22, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Aug 19, 2019Order Correcting Scriveners Error
Date: Aug 19, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Aug 19, 2019Motion for Order to Show Cause
Date: Aug 15, 2019Certificate of Service
Date: Jul 31, 2019Case Management Conference Order
Date: Jun 25, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Jun 25, 2019Notice of Appearance
Date: Jun 25, 2019Cross Notice
Date: Jun 17, 2019Motion to Correct Scriveners Error
Date: Jun 12, 2019Certificate of Service
Date: May 03, 2019Certificate of Service
Date: May 01, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Apr 29, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Apr 29, 2019Order Granting Motion to Substitute Party Plaintiff
Date: Apr 29, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: Apr 10, 2019Motion for Substitution of Party(S)
Date: Mar 25, 2019Motion for Order to Show Cause
Date: Mar 06, 2019Response to Motion
Date: Jun 01, 2018Response to Motion
Date: Jun 01, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: May 24, 2018Certificate of Service
Date: Apr 27, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Apr 17, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Apr 17, 2018Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic
Date: Apr 16, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: Apr 16, 2018Motion for Default
Date: Apr 12, 2018Default
Date: Apr 12, 2018Non-Military Affidavit
Date: Apr 12, 2018Affidavit
Date: Apr 12, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: Apr 09, 2018Certificate of Service
Date: Mar 23, 2018Certificate of Service
Date: Mar 21, 2018Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Mar 19, 2018Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Mar 19, 2018Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Mar 19, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: Mar 08, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Mar 07, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: Mar 07, 2018Order Extending Time
Date: Mar 07, 2018Agreed Order
Date: Feb 26, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Feb 22, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: Feb 07, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: Feb 05, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 30, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: Jan 24, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: Jan 22, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Jan 22, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Jan 22, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Jan 22, 2018Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Jan 19, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: Jan 16, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: Jan 13, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: Jan 13, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 05, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 05, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 05, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 05, 2018Value Claim Form
Date: Jan 05, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 05, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 05, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 05, 2018Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: Jan 05, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 06-24-2020 8:45 AM; ROOM 15160 |
|
March 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Management Conference | |
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw CAS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFFParty: Plaintiff U.S. BANK TRUST N.A. AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST |
|
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Order SETTING MANDATORY CMC ON 3/25/2020 @ 8:45 AM RM 15160 |
|
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Management Conference | |
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service Party: Plaintiff U.S. BANK TRUST N.A. AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST |
|
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 02-25-2020 8:45 AM; ROOM 15160 |
|
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Management Conference | |
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 01-08-2020 8:45 AM |
|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference rm 15160 01-08-2020 8:45 AM |
|
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCEParty: Plaintiff U.S. BANK TRUST N.A. AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST | |
October 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw Party: Defendant Gomez, Francine Defendant Gomez, Ismel |
|
October 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw Party: Defendant Gomez, Ismel Defendant Gomez, Francine |
|
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference rm 15160 11-18-2019 8:45 AM |
|
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 11-18-2019 8:45 AM; ROOM 15160 |
|
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service OF ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCEParty: Plaintiff U.S. BANK TRUST N.A. AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST |
|
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate OF SERVICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSEParty: Plaintiff U.S. BANK TRUST N.A. AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST |
|
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 09-24-2019 8:45 AM; ROOM 15160 |
|
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Correcting Scrivener's Error correcting plaintiff name |
|
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 09-24-2019 8:45 AM |
|
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Order to Show Cause PLAINTIFF'S FLA. STAT. 702.10(2) MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER TO MAKE PAYMNTS DURING FORECLOSURE OR VACATE THE PREMISESParty: Plaintiff Specialized Loan Servicing LLC |
|
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service copy of ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCEParty: Plaintiff Specialized Loan Servicing LLC |
|
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Order SETTING MANDATORY CMC ON 8/19/19 @ 8:45 AM RM 15160 |
|
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 08-19-2019 8:45 AM; ROOM 15160 |
|
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Plaintiff Specialized Loan Servicing LLC |
|
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Cross Notice OF HEARING--RM 15160 June 25, 2019, at 8:45 AM |
|
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Correct Scriveners Error Party: Plaintiff Specialized Loan Servicing LLC |
|
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service Party: Plaintiff Specialized Loan Servicing LLC |
|
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service copy ofthe ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 06-25-2019 8:45 AM |
|
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 06-25-2019 8:45 AM; ROOM 15160 |
|
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion to Substitute Party Plaintiff | |
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Substitution of Party(S) MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PARTIES AND AMEND CASE STYLEParty: Plaintiff Specialized Loan Servicing LLC |
|
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Order to Show Cause And Entry of Final Judgment of ForeclosureParty: Defendant Building One of Racquet Club Apartments at Bonaventure 6 Condominium Association, Inc. |
|
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Motion Party: Defendant Gomez, Francine Defendant Gomez, Ismel |
|
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Motion Party: Defendant Gomez, Ismel Defendant Gomez, Francine |
|
May 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service Party: Plaintiff Specialized Loan Servicing LLC |
|
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference RM 14160 05-22-2018 8:45 AM |
|
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 05-22-2018 8:45 AM; ROOM 14160 |
|
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 3Party: Plaintiff Specialized Loan Servicing LLC |
|
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Party: Plaintiff Specialized Loan Servicing LLC |
|
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 3Party: Plaintiff Specialized Loan Servicing LLC |
|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Party: Plaintiff Specialized Loan Servicing LLC |
|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Default against, UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 1 N/K/A SANTIAGO ESCOBAR, and UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 2 N/K/A ALICE ENAOParty: Defendant Town Center Club Authority Inc |
|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Non-Military Affidavit Party: Plaintiff Specialized Loan Servicing LLC |
|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Party: Plaintiff Specialized Loan Servicing LLC |
|
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Reply to Affirmative Defenses | |
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service copy of the ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCEParty: Plaintiff Specialized Loan Servicing LLC |
|
March 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service Party: Plaintiff Specialized Loan Servicing LLC |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses That as to the facts and allegations contained within numbered paragraphs 11,15,16,17, 18,19,20, and21 thereof Defendants are WITHOUT sufficient information or knowledge concerning same and thereforemust DENY and demand strict proof thereofParty: Defendant Gomez, Francine Defendant Gomez, Ismel |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Gomez, Francine Defendant Gomez, Ismel |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Gomez, Ismel Defendant Gomez, Francine |
|
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Management Conference | |
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 04-17-2018 8:45 AM |
|
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Extending Time | |
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT |
|
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 2/3/2018- UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 2 |
|
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Reply to Affirmative Defenses | |
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: JENNIFER M SCOTT ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A015395; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 2 |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 1/11/2018Party: Defendant Gomez, Ismel |
|
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 1/17/2018 unknown tenant #1 nka Santiago Escobar |
|
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO SERVE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINTParty: Defendant Gomez, Francine Defendant Gomez, Ismel |
|
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance LEAD COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516Party: Defendant Gomez, Francine Defendant Gomez, Ismel |
|
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO SERVE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINTParty: Defendant Gomez, Ismel Defendant Gomez, Francine |
|
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Building One of Racquet Club Apartments at Bonaventure 6 Condominium Association, Inc. |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 1/11/2018Party: Defendant Gomez, Ismel |
|
January 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 1/10/2018Party: Defendant Town Center Club Authority Inc |
|
January 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 1/10/2018Party: Defendant Building One of Racquet Club Apartments at Bonaventure 6 Condominium Association, Inc. |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 1 |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance TOWN CENTER CLUB AUTHORITY, INC |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance ISMEL GOMEZ |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Value Claim Form | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) FOR FORECLOSE MORTGAGEParty: Plaintiff Specialized Loan Servicing LLC |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: NICHOLAS J ROEFARO ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A002380; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Defendant Count > than 5 Payor: NICHOLAS J ROEFARO ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A002380; ;Amount: $5.00 |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance FRANCINE GOMEZ |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance BUILDING ONE OF RACQUET CLUB APARTMENTS AT BONAVENTURE 6 CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid Payor: NICHOLAS J ROEFARO ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A002380; ;Amount: $906.00 |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Lis Pendens |