Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Catherine Gonzalez Plaintiff vs. Catalina Duffo Mendez Defendant
On January 02, 2018 an auto negligence case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 02, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
, Jr.;Category
Auto Negligence
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Settlement
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT IT (NEGLIGENCE OF FRANCIS CATALINA DUFFO MENDEZ)
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Catherine Gonzalez against defendants Francis Edward O'Dowd Jr. and Catalina Duffo Mendez. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of both defendants resulting in bodily injury and other damages to the plaintiff. T…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Notice of Settlement
Date: Dec 11, 2020Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: Oct 16, 2020Notice of Filing
Date: Dec 10, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: Oct 23, 2019eSummons Issuance - Pluries
Date: Oct 23, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: Oct 23, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: Oct 23, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: Oct 23, 2019Order Setting Aside Default
Date: Jun 24, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: Jun 03, 2019eSummons Issuance - Alias
Date: Mar 08, 2019Order Granting Motion
Date: Dec 20, 2018Motion for Default
Date: Nov 08, 2018Acceptance of Offer of Judgment
Date: Oct 05, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: Sep 25, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: Sep 25, 2018Request for Production
Date: Sep 25, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: Sep 25, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: Sep 21, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Sep 21, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: Aug 31, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: Aug 21, 2018Motion for Substitution of Counsel
Date: Aug 21, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Aug 01, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: Jul 26, 2018Notice of Video Deposition
Date: Jun 29, 2018Request for Compulsory Physical Examination
Date: Jun 29, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: Jun 05, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Jun 05, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: May 07, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: May 04, 2018Request for Production
Date: May 04, 2018Interrogatories Notice of Filing
Date: May 04, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: May 04, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: May 03, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: May 02, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: May 02, 2018Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: May 02, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Apr 26, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Apr 26, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Apr 23, 2018Motion to Withdraw
Date: Apr 16, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 02, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 02, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff Gonzalez, Catherine |
|
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing | |
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
October 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: RAPHAEL A SANCHEZ ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A191980; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint | |
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance - Pluries CATALINA DUFFO MENDEZ |
|
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing RETURNED SERVICE OF PROCESS PACKAGE TO DEFENDANT, CATALINA DUFFO MENDEZ |
|
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE UPON DEFENDANT, CATALINA DUFFO MENDEZ |
|
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing RETURN OF NON SERVICE OF DEFENDANT, CATALINA DUFFO MENDEZ |
|
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Aside Default as to Df Catalina Duffo Mendez |
|
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: RAPHAEL A SANCHEZ ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A037547; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance - Alias CATALINA DUFFO MENDEZ |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME |
|
November 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default AS TO DEFENDANT, CATALINA DUFFO MENDEZParty: Plaintiff Gonzalez, Catherine |
|
October 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Acceptance of Offer of Judgment | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Admissions | |
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production Party: Plaintiff Gonzalez, Catherine |
|
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories GENERAL PERSONAL INJURYParty: Plaintiff Gonzalez, Catherine |
|
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Party: Plaintiff Gonzalez, Catherine |
|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Substitution of Counsel Tomas R. Hernandez Esq FBN 95598Party: Plaintiff Gonzalez, Catherine |
|
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Party: Defendant O'Dowd, Francis Edward, Jr\. |
|
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Video Deposition Catherine Gonzalez |
|
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Compulsory Physical Examination | |
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Admissions TO DEFENDANT FRANCIS EDWARD O'DOWD JR.'S REQUESTParty: Plaintiff Gonzalez, Catherine |
|
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO DEF-FRANCIS EDWARD O'DOWD, Jr\.'S DISCOVERY REQUESTSParty: Plaintiff Gonzalez, Catherine |
|
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses | |
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production TO PLAINTIFFParty: Defendant O'Dowd, Francis Edward, Jr\. |
|
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Interrogatories & Notice of Filing Defendant, FRANK E. 0'DOWD JR |
|
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Admissions | |
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 05/02/18 @ 8:59 AMParty: Defendant O'Dowd, Francis Edward, Jr\. |
|
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served April 27, 2018 at 5:52pmParty: Defendant Mendez, Catalina Duffo |
|
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Plaintiff Gonzalez, Catherine |
|
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINTParty: Defendant O'Dowd, Francis Edward, Jr\. |
|
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: DEREK CAVADA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A056624; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Party: Defendant Mendez, Catalina Duffo |
|
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Party: Defendant O'Dowd, Francis Edward, Jr\. |
|
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Derek Cavada FBN 109414Party: Plaintiff Gonzalez, Catherine |
|
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw Derek Cavada Esq FBN 109414Party: Plaintiff Gonzalez, Catherine |
|
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: MATTHEW H HINSON ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A000678; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) For DamagesParty: Plaintiff Gonzalez, Catherine |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | No Summons Issued |