Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
American Homeowner Preservation LLC, et al Plaintiff vs. Lakeside Portfolio Management LLC Defendant
On January 02, 2018 contract and indebtedness case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Phillips, Carol-Lisa presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 02, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Judge
Hon. Phillips, Carol-Lisa
Category
Contract and Indebtedness
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Closed
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I- BREACH OF NOTE
COUNT II - BREACH OF NOTE (BIGDEL. ARI v IE)
COUNT If - UNJUST ENRICHMENT AHP v LAKESIDE)
COUNT V - CIVIL THEFT PURUSANT TO FLA. STAT. § 772.11 AHP vy LAKESIDE)
COUNT VI - CIVIL THEFT PURUSANT TO FLA. STAT. § 772.11 (BIGDELIZAZARI y LAKESIDE)
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by American Homeowner Preservation, LLC (AHP) and Ali Bigdelizazari against Lakeside Portfolio Management, LLC. The complaint alleges breach of two promissory notes, one in favor of AHP in the amount of $27,500.00 and the …...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Notice of Appearance
Date: Jul 06, 2021Order Granting Motion to Compel
Date: Mar 11, 2019Notice
Date: Jul 25, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Jul 11, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: May 14, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Apr 20, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: Apr 17, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Mar 30, 2018Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Date: Mar 14, 2018Affidavit of Reasonable Attorney Fees
Date: Mar 14, 2018Affidavit of Attorney Fees
Date: Mar 14, 2018Affidavit of Costs
Date: Mar 14, 2018Affidavit of Indebtedness
Date: Mar 14, 2018Motion for Default Default
Date: Feb 14, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: Jan 11, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 02, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 02, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 02, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Plaintiff American Homeowner Preservation LLC Plaintiff BIGDELIZAZARI, ALI |
|
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion to Compel | |
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENTParty: Plaintiff American Homeowner Preservation LLC Plaintiff BIGDELIZAZARI, ALI |
|
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
March 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion for Partial Summary Judgment | |
March 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Reasonable Attorney Fees | |
March 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Attorney Fees | |
March 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Costs | |
March 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Indebtedness | |
March 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Indebtedness | |
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default & Default againstParty: Defendant Lakeside Portfolio Management LLC |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 01/05/2018Party: Defendant Lakeside Portfolio Management LLC |
|
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: HARRIS S. HOWARD ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A000663; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: HARRIS S. HOWARD ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A000663; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance LAKESIDE PORTFOLIO MANAGEMENT, LLC |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) FOR DAMAGESParty: Plaintiff American Homeowner Preservation LLC |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet |