Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Citizens Property Insurance Corporation Plaintiff vs. 24 Hrs Restoration Inc Defendant
On January 02, 2018 contract and indebtedness case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 02, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Contract and Indebtedness
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Closed
Overview
. Waiver Or Change Of Policy Provisions
A waiver or change of a provision of this Policy
must be in writing by us to be valid. Our request for
an appraisal or examination will not waive any of
our rights.
C. Cancellation
You may cancel this Policy at any time by
returning it to us or by letting us know in writing
of the date cancellation is to take effect.
If a state of emergency is declared by the
Governor and the Commissioner of Insurance
Regulation files an Emergency Order, and the
“residence premises” has been damaged as a
result of a hurricane or wind loss that is the
subject of the declared emergency, we may
cancel this Policy only for the following
reasons, with respect to the period beginning
from the date the state of emergency is
declared to the expiration of 90 days following
the repairs to the dwelling or other structure
located on the “residence premises", by letting
the first named insured know in writing of the
date cancellation takes effect.
This cancellation notice will be delivered to the
first named insured or mailed to the first named
insured at the mailing address shown in the
Declarations.
Proof of mailing will be sufficient proof of notice.
a. When you have not paid the premium, we
may cancel during this period by letting the
first named insured know at least 10 days
before the date cancellation takes effect.
b. If:
(1) There has been a material misstatement
or fraud related to the claim;
HOMEOWNERS
Causes of Action
Claim Information
Claim Information
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Citizens Property Insurance Corporation ("Citizens") against 24 HRS Restoration, Inc. A/A/O Belkys Fernandez. The nature of the action is specific performance to enforce a contract of insurance that is the subject of an…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Notice of Limited Appearance
Date: Jun 06, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: Jun 06, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Feb 06, 2018Response to Motion to Dismiss
Date: Feb 01, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: Jan 22, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 02, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 02, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 02, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Limited Appearance Party: Plaintiff Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Party: Plaintiff Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Motion to Dismiss | |
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Party: Defendant 24 Hrs Restoration Inc |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance 24 Hrs Restoration Inc |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: NANCY I STEIN-MCCARTHY ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A000489; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: NANCY I STEIN-MCCARTHY ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A000489; ;Amount: $10.00 |