Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Lorraine Myers Plaintiff vs. Julio Padilla, et al Defendant
On January 02, 2018 an auto negligence case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Lopane, Nicholas presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 02, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 08, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Auto Negligence
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Closed
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I NEGLIGENCE AGAINST JULIO PADILLA
COUNT II NEGLIGENCE - VICARIOUS LIABILITY
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Lorraine Myers against Julio Padilla and Lola Land, Inc. (formerly known as National Tool Supply, Inc.) in the Circuit Court of the 17th Judicial Circuit in Broward County, Florida. The complaint seeks damages in excess…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Request for Copies
Date: Sep 11, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: Sep 11, 2018Answer of Garnishee
Date: Aug 20, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: Jun 25, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: May 08, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: Apr 16, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Apr 16, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: Apr 09, 2018Request for Production
Date: Feb 28, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: Feb 28, 2018Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Feb 28, 2018Interrogatories Notice of Filing
Date: Jan 02, 2018Request for Production
Date: Jan 02, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: Jan 02, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: Jan 02, 2018Request for Production
Date: Jan 02, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 02, 2018Interrogatories Notice of Filing
Date: Jan 02, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Answer of Garnishee | |
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request to Produce | |
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories | |
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
March 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Privilege Log | |
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Party: Defendant Padilla, Julio Defendant Lola Land Inc |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Party: Plaintiff Myers, Lorraine |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Padilla, Julio Defendant Lola Land Inc |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Disclosure | |
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Interrogatories & Notice of Service Party: Defendant Padilla, Julio Defendant Lola Land Inc |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Padilla, Julio Defendant Lola Land Inc |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Interrogatories & Notice of Filing To Lola Land IncParty: Plaintiff Myers, Lorraine |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production To Julio PadillaParty: Plaintiff Myers, Lorraine |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions To Julio PadillaParty: Plaintiff Myers, Lorraine |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions To Lola Land IncParty: Plaintiff Myers, Lorraine |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production To Lola Land IncParty: Plaintiff Myers, Lorraine |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Myers, Lorraine |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Interrogatories & Notice of Filing To Julio PadillaParty: Plaintiff Myers, Lorraine |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | eSummons Issuance | |
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: KEVIN BRUCE DENNIS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A000485; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: KEVIN BRUCE DENNIS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A000485; ;Amount: $401.00 |