Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Fernando J Acosta, et al Plaintiff vs. Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company Defendant
On January 02, 2018 contract and indebtedness case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 02, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Jack Ben;Category
Contract and Indebtedness
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Closed
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I BREACH OF CONTRACT
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Fernando J Acosta and Miriam Acosta against Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company. The plaintiffs allege that they had an insurance policy with the defendant that provided coverage for their property located…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Notice of Cancellation
Date: Oct 08, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: Aug 16, 2018Notice of Filing Interrogs
Date: Aug 08, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: Aug 08, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: Aug 08, 2018Agreed Order
Date: Jul 23, 2018Order Extending Time
Date: Jul 23, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: Jul 20, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Jun 28, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Jun 28, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: Jun 27, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Mar 13, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Mar 13, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Mar 12, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: Jan 29, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Jan 14, 2018Notice of Service
Date: Jan 11, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: Jan 02, 2018Request for Production
Date: Jan 02, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 02, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 02, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Jan 02, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: Jan 02, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 02, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Interrogs | |
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order ON MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS |
|
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Extending Time | |
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS DESIGNATIONParty: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
June 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel DEPOSITIONSParty: Plaintiff Acosta, Fernando J Plaintiff Acosta, Miriam |
|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REOUESTSParty: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint Party: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions to Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance CompanyParty: Plaintiff Acosta, Fernando J Plaintiff Acosta, Miriam |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production to Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance CompanyParty: Plaintiff Acosta, Fernando J Plaintiff Acosta, Miriam |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) for DamgesParty: Plaintiff Acosta, Fernando J Plaintiff Acosta, Miriam |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: Jack BenMELEH ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A000480; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Corporate Representative of Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs to Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance CompanyParty: Plaintiff Acosta, Fernando J Plaintiff Acosta, Miriam |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: Jack BenMELEH ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A000480; ;Amount: $10.00 |