Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Nelson Petigny, et al Plaintiff vs. Geovera Specialty Insurance Company Defendant
On January 02, 2018 an other - insurance claim case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 02, 2018
Last Refreshed
October 06, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Other - Insurance Claim
Practice Area
Insurance
Matter Type
Insurance Coverage
Status
Closed
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I~ BREACH OF CONTRACT
COUNT Il ~ BREACH OF CONTRACT
COUNT III - PETITION FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF
COUNT IV - PETITION FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by the Plaintiffs, Nelson Petigny and Marie Pierre, against the Defendant, Geovera Specialty Insurance Company. The Plaintiffs are seeking damages in excess of $15,000 per cause of action. They allege that the Defendant, a…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Motion to Enforce
Date: Dec 16, 2019Motion to Enforce
Date: Dec 16, 2019Motion to Enforce
Date: Jun 24, 2019Response to Request for Production
Date: Aug 30, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: Apr 20, 2018Request for Production of Documents
Date: Feb 13, 2018Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Jan 31, 2018Request for Production
Date: Jan 02, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 02, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Enforce SETTLEMENTParty: Plaintiff Pierre, Marie Plaintiff Petigny, Nelson |
|
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Enforce SETTLEMENTParty: Plaintiff Petigny, Nelson Plaintiff Pierre, Marie |
|
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Enforce Party: Defendant Geovera Specialty Insurance Company |
|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Privilege Log | |
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Party: Defendant Geovera Specialty Insurance Company |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production of Documents Party: Defendant Geovera Specialty Insurance Company |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Interrogatories & Notice of Service Party: Defendant Geovera Specialty Insurance Company |
|
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Geovera Specialty Insurance Company |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Party: Plaintiff Petigny, Nelson Plaintiff Pierre, Marie |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Petigny, Nelson Plaintiff Pierre, Marie |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses JOHN A. SALCEDOParty: Plaintiff Petigny, Nelson Plaintiff Pierre, Marie |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs FIRSTParty: Plaintiff Petigny, Nelson Plaintiff Pierre, Marie |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVESParty: Plaintiff Petigny, Nelson Plaintiff Pierre, Marie |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: PETER J. MINEO ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A000339; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: PETER J. MINEO ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A000339; ;Amount: $10.00 |