Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Beverly Hills Condominium Number Three Inc Plaintiff vs. Robert Piecuch, et al Defendant
On January 02, 2018 a condominium action case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Bowman, John B. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 02, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 08, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Condominium Action
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Condominium
Status
Default Judgment
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I - FORECLOSURE
COUNT II - BREACH OF CONTRACT - MONEY JUDGMENT
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Beverly Hills Condominium Number Three, Inc. against the defendants Robert Piecuch, Cheryl Wallace, and any unknown tenants. The complaint is for foreclosure of a claim of lien for assessments. The plaintiff, Beverly Hi…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 02, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic Party: Plaintiff Beverly Hills Condominium Number Three Inc |
|
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Final Judgment Party: Plaintiff Beverly Hills Condominium Number Three Inc |
|
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 20th day of March, 2018 at 8:45a.m RM 15165 |
|
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE ATTORNEY FEES | |
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S TIME AND COSTS | |
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS | |
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default & Default AgainstParty: Defendant Wallace, Cheryl |
|
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 02/06/2018.Party: Defendant Wallace, Cheryl |
|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default & Default againstParty: Defendant Piecuch, Robert |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 1/08/2018, ON ROBERT PIECUCH |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved ANY UNKNOWN TENANTS |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) FOR FORECLOSUREParty: Plaintiff Beverly Hills Condominium Number Three Inc Plaintiff Wallace, Cheryl |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance ANY UNKNOWN TENANTS |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance ROBERT PIECUCH |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Lis Pendens | |
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: RHONDA HOLLANDER ESQ ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A000335; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance CHERYL WALLACE |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: RHONDA HOLLANDER ESQ ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A000335; ;Amount: $10.00 |