Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Convenient Wholesalers of America Inc Plaintiff vs. Alliance Int'l Distributors Inc, et al Defendant
On January 02, 2018 contract and indebtedness case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Perlman, Sandra presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 02, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Contract and Indebtedness
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Active
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT II BREACH OF PERSONAL GUARANTY
COUNT IV FRAUD
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by The Convenient Wholesalers of America, Inc. (CWA) against Alliance Int'l Distributors, Inc. and Aamir R. Khan. CWA is seeking damages in excess of $15,000. The complaint alleges that Alliance ordered and received produc…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Order Placing Case on Inactive Status
Date: Jan 09, 2020Suggestion of Bankruptcy
Date: Nov 22, 2019Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: Nov 21, 2019Order Granting Motion to Withdraw
Date: Jan 22, 2019Order Granting Motion
Date: Dec 06, 2018Motion to Appear Telephonically
Date: Dec 05, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Dec 05, 2018Motion to Withdraw
Date: Dec 05, 2018Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Sep 18, 2018Order Denying Motion to Dismiss
Date: Aug 29, 2018Agreed Order
Date: Aug 27, 2018Order
Date: Aug 23, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Jul 19, 2018Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Jul 11, 2018Motion to Dismiss 2nd Amended Complaint
Date: Jul 11, 2018Motion for Default
Date: Jul 09, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: Jun 13, 2018Order Granting Motion
Date: May 24, 2018Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: May 10, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: May 03, 2018Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Apr 23, 2018Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint
Date: Apr 20, 2018Order Granting Leave to Amend Complaint
Date: Apr 03, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Mar 14, 2018Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: Mar 12, 2018Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Feb 28, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: Feb 28, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: Feb 19, 2018Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: Feb 15, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Feb 14, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Feb 09, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Feb 09, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Feb 09, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: Jan 24, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: Jan 23, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 05, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 05, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 02, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 02, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Placing Case on Inactive Status | |
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Suggestion of Bankruptcy SBA # 18-23908 SMGParty: Defendant Khan, Aamir R |
|
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing | |
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion to Withdraw AS ATTNY FOR DEFTS |
|
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Appear Telephonically Party: Defendant Alliance Int'l Distributors Inc Defendant Khan, Aamir R |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 1/16/2019 @ 8:45AM, RM 16165 |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw Party: Defendant Alliance Int'l Distributors Inc Defendant Khan, Aamir R |
|
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINTParty: Defendant Khan, Aamir R |
|
August 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint |
|
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT |
|
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order TO MEET AND CONFER |
|
July 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
July 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINTParty: Defendant Alliance Int'l Distributors Inc |
|
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss 2nd Amended Complaint Party: Defendant Khan, Aamir R |
|
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default by the Court against Defendant, AAMIR R. KHAN ("KHANParty: Plaintiff Convenient Wholesalers of America Inc |
|
June 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint Party: Plaintiff Convenient Wholesalers of America Inc |
|
May 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Hearing | |
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Alliance Int'l Distributors Inc |
|
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint Party: Defendant Khan, Aamir R |
|
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Granting Leave to Amend Complaint | |
March 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Leave to Amend PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINTParty: Plaintiff Convenient Wholesalers of America Inc |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Alliance Int'l Distributors Inc |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Party: Defendant Khan, Aamir R |
|
February 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Hearing | |
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Samir Masri, Esquire FBN: 145513Party: Defendant Khan, Aamir R |
|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Alliance Int'l Distributors Inc Defendant Khan, Aamir R |
|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Samir Masri, Esquire FBN: 145513Party: Defendant Alliance Int'l Distributors Inc |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 17th day of January, 2018Party: Defendant Alliance Int'l Distributors Inc |
|
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 1/20/18Party: Defendant Khan, Aamir R |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: YASIR BILLOO ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A002669; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance To: ALLIANCE INT'L DISTRIBUTORS, INC |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance To: AAMIR R. KHAN |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Convenient Wholesalers of America Inc |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: YASIR BILLOO ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A000169; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | No Summons Issued |