Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Deutsche Bank Nat Trust Co Plaintiff vs. Silvestre Espinosa, et al Defendant
On December 18, 2015 a real prop homestead res fore =/>$250,000 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 18, 2015
Last Refreshed
September 08, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Real Prop Homestead Res Fore =/>$250,000
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Closed
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE
COUNT It REFORMATION OF MORTGAGE
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for Residential Asset Securitization Trust Series 2006-A4 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2006-D against Angela Espinosa, Silvestre Espinosa…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Sep 22, 2016Order Granting Motion to Amend
Date: Aug 31, 2016Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: Jul 19, 2016Response to Request for Admissions
Date: Feb 12, 2016Response to Request for Production
Date: Feb 12, 2016Request for Admissions
Date: Feb 11, 2016Request for Production
Date: Feb 11, 2016Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Feb 09, 2016Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: Jan 22, 2016Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Dec 18, 2015Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Form
Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Espinosa, Silvestre Defendant Espinosa, Angela Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion to Amend COMPLAINT/DEEMED FILED Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
August 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing
Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
July 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Leave to Amend COMPLAINTParty: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank Nat Trust Co Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD AND DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATIONParty: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank Nat Trust Co Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 1/6/2016Party: Defendant Espinosa, Angela Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved Party: Defendant Crossbow Homeowners Assn Inc Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 1/6/2016Party: Defendant Espinosa, Silvestre Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
February 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories Party: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank Nat Trust Co Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
February 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Admissions Party: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank Nat Trust Co Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
February 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production Party: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank Nat Trust Co Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Party: Defendant Espinosa, Silvestre Defendant Espinosa, Angela Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Party: Defendant Espinosa, Silvestre Defendant Espinosa, Angela Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Interrogatories NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Espinosa, Silvestre Defendant Espinosa, Angela Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Enlargement of Time Party: Defendant Espinosa, Angela Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Espinosa, Silvestre Defendant Espinosa, Angela Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid Payor: NAZISH ZAHEER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A181181; ;Amount: $1,906.00 Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: NAZISH ZAHEER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A181181; ;Amount: $10.00 Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank Nat Trust Co Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Sheet
Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Party: Defendant Espinosa, Silvestre Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Party: Defendant Espinosa, Angela Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance c/o Tim Slack, Registered AgentParty: Defendant Crossbow Homeowners Assn Inc Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Value Claim Form
Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Lis Pendens
Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Certification Pursuant to Fla.Stat.702.015 Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |