Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Josephine Leers Plaintiff vs. First Floridian Auto & Home Ins Co Defendant
On December 18, 2015 an other - insurance claim case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Phillips, Carol-Lisa presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 18, 2015
Last Refreshed
September 08, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Judge
Hon. Phillips, Carol-Lisa
Category
Other - Insurance Claim
Practice Area
Insurance
Matter Type
Insurance Coverage
Status
Closed
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Josephine Leers against First Floridian Auto and Home Insurance Company. The plaintiff is seeking damages in excess of $15,000, exclusive of court costs, attorney's fees, and interest. The plaintiff is a resident of Bro…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Report
Date: Jul 20, 2016Mediation Report
Date: Jul 15, 2016Notice of Mediation
Date: Jun 13, 2016Answer to Interrogs
Date: Apr 15, 2016Response to Request to Produce
Date: Apr 15, 2016Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: Feb 10, 2016Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Jan 21, 2016Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Dec 18, 2015Request to Produce
Date: Dec 18, 2015Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Report OF MEDIATOR Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
July 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Mediation Report A confidential Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Mediation July 14, 2016 @ 1:30PM Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer to Interrogs DEFENDANT'S UNVERIFIED RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIESParty: Defendant First Floridian Auto & Home Ins Co Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Response to Request to Produce Party: Defendant First Floridian Auto & Home Ins Co Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
February 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Reply to Affirmative Defenses Party: Plaintiff Leers, Josephine Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
January 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant First Floridian Auto & Home Ins Co Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: JAY M ARNESEN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A181089; ;Amount: $10.00 Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: JAY M ARNESEN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A181089; ;Amount: $401.00 Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Leers, Josephine Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request to Produce Defendant, First Floridian Auto & Home Ins CoParty: Plaintiff Leers, Josephine Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Chief Financial Officer as R.AParty: Defendant First Floridian Auto & Home Ins Co Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs Defendant, First Floridian Auto & Home Ins CoParty: Plaintiff Leers, Josephine Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Sheet
Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |