Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Neil Ricketts Plaintiff vs. Citizens Property Ins Corp Defendant
On December 18, 2015 contract and indebtedness case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Haury, William W., Jr. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 18, 2015
Last Refreshed
September 08, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
, Jr.;Category
Contract and Indebtedness
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Closed
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Neil Ricketts against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation. The complaint alleges that Neil Ricketts owns a property located at 7552 Viscaya Circle, Margate, Florida, which is insured by Citizens Property Insurance C…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Request for Production of Documents
Date: Feb 11, 2016Request for Admissions
Date: Feb 11, 2016Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Dec 18, 2015Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Amended NOTICE OF TAKING TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Production of Documents FIRST REQUESTParty: Plaintiff Ricketts, Neil Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Party: Plaintiff Ricketts, Neil Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Interrogatories & Notice of Service FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIESParty: Plaintiff Ricketts, Neil Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance AS COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSESParty: Defendant Citizens Property Ins Corp Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: SCOT STREMS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A180209; ;Amount: $10.00 Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: SCOT STREMS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A180209; ;Amount: $401.00 Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Ricketts, Neil Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Party: Defendant Citizens Property Ins Corp Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Sheet
Judge: 18 Haury, William W., Jr. |