Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Pauline Taylor, et al Plaintiff vs. Federated National Insurance Co Defendant
On December 03, 2015 contract and indebtedness case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Phillips, Carol-Lisa presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 03, 2015
Last Refreshed
September 08, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Judge
Hon. Phillips, Carol-Lisa
Category
Contract and Indebtedness
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Closed
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Pauline Taylor and Leroy Taylor against Federated National Insurance Company. The plaintiffs are residents of Broward County, Florida, and the defendant is a Florida corporation engaged in selling homeowners insurance p…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Order on Motion to Compel
Date: Mar 05, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: Jan 05, 2018Motion to Tax Costs
Date: Apr 11, 2017Notice of Interrogatories
Date: Jan 26, 2017Order Granting Motion
Date: Jan 18, 2017Motion to Compel
Date: Jan 16, 2017Ex Parte Order to Compel
Date: Dec 01, 2016Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: Nov 21, 2016Supplemental Interrogatories
Date: Oct 26, 2016Motion to Compel
Date: Aug 01, 2016Notice of Interrogatories
Date: Jun 20, 2016Response to Request for Production
Date: Jun 03, 2016Interrogatories Notice of Filing
Date: Jun 03, 2016Motion to Compel
Date: May 17, 2016Answer to Amended Complaint
Date: May 16, 2016Supplemental Interrogatories
Date: May 16, 2016Amended Complaint
Date: May 04, 2016Agreed Order
Date: Apr 14, 2016Notice of Filing
Date: Apr 14, 2016Response to Request for Admissions
Date: Mar 10, 2016Motion to Dismiss
Date: Feb 17, 2016Request for Admissions
Date: Feb 10, 2016Notice of Filing
Date: Jan 18, 2016Request to Produce
Date: Jan 18, 2016Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Jan 14, 2016Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Jan 14, 2016Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Dec 03, 2015Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order on Motion to Compel COMPLIANCE WITH ORDER DATED 10/17/17 Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation
Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing
Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Party: Defendant Federated National Insurance Co Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
October 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Attorney Fees
Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation
Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
September 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing
Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
August 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation
Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
July 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing
Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing
Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion to Tax Costs Party: Defendant Federated National Insurance Co Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation
Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
February 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing
Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
January 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatories Party: Plaintiff Taylor, Pauline Plaintiff Taylor, Leroy Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH COURT ORDER DATED 7/19/16 Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
January 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel COMPLIANCE WITH COURT ORDER DATED 12/1/16Party: Defendant Federated National Insurance Co Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
January 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation
Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation
Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing
Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Order to Compel SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DISCVOERY Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
November 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Motion TO COMPEL SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERYParty: Defendant Federated National Insurance Co Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment
Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing
Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing CERTIFIED COPY OF INSURANCE POLICYParty: Defendant Federated National Insurance Co Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Interrogatories
Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
August 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel COMPLIANCE WITH THE JULY 19, 20161 COURT ORDER AND REOUEST FOR SANCTIONSParty: Defendant Federated National Insurance Co Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
July 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Compelling Discovery EX-PARTE ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S EX-PARTE MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY /GRANTED; PLTF SHALL COMPL W/IN (10) DAYS Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
July 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Compelling Discovery EX-PARTE ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S EX-PARTE MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY /GRANTED; (10) DAYS Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Motion TO COMPEL DISCOVERYParty: Defendant Federated National Insurance Co Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatories PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIESParty: Plaintiff Taylor, Pauline Plaintiff Taylor, Leroy Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
June 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production Party: Plaintiff Taylor, Pauline Plaintiff Taylor, Leroy Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
June 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Interrogatories & Notice of Filing Party: Plaintiff Taylor, Pauline Plaintiff Taylor, Leroy Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
May 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel COMPLIANCE WITH COURT ORDER DATED MAY 5, 2016 AND REOUEST FOR SANCTIONSParty: Defendant Federated National Insurance Co Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
May 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer to Amended Complaint Party: Defendant Federated National Insurance Co Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
May 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Interrogatories Party: Defendant Federated National Insurance Co Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
May 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation Of hearing. June 14, 2016 at 08:45 A.M Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
May 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGESParty: Plaintiff Taylor, Pauline Plaintiff Taylor, Leroy
Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
May 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum Pauline Taylor Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
May 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum Leroy Taylor Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
May 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Order GRANTING DEFENDANT'S EX-PARTE MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel DEPOSITION AND FOR SANCTIONSParty: Defendant Federated National Insurance Co Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
April 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Acceptance of Service on Insurance Commissioner 1/11/16Party: Defendant Federated National Insurance Co Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF TRIVON TAYLOR IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S 57.105 MOTION FOR TTORNEY'S FEES Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation of hearing 04/14/2016 Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
March 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Motion TO COMPEL DISCOVERYParty: Defendant Federated National Insurance Co Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing APRIL 14, 2016 @ 08:45 A.M. Rm 1020B Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Admissions Party: Plaintiff Taylor, Pauline Plaintiff Taylor, Leroy Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Attorney Fees Party: Defendant Federated National Insurance Co Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss OR MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENTParty: Defendant Federated National Insurance Co Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
February 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Party: Defendant Federated National Insurance Co Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
January 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF (copy attached)Party: Defendant Federated National Insurance Co Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
January 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request to Produce TO PLAINTIFFParty: Defendant Federated National Insurance Co Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
January 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINTParty: Defendant Federated National Insurance Co Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
January 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Federated National Insurance Co Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Reservation of Rights to Trial By Jury Party: Defendant Federated National Insurance Co Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR TRIAL BY JURYParty: Defendant Federated National Insurance Co Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Party: Defendant Federated National Insurance Co Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Federated National Insurance Co Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: LEO MANZANILLA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A174505; ;Amount: $10.00 Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: LEO MANZANILLA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A174505; ;Amount: $401.00 Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Sheet
Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Taylor, Pauline Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Party: Plaintiff Taylor, Pauline Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Party: Defendant Federated National Ins Co Judge: 25 Phillips, Carol-Lisa |