Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Bank Of America NA Plaintiff vs. Paul Desir, et al Defendant
On December 19, 2012 a real prop non-homestead res fore - >$50k - <$250,000 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 19, 2012
Last Refreshed
March 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Category
Real Prop Non-Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
March 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved The Unk Spouse of Andres F Mambuca |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 12-20-12 tenant nka jenny mondesir |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 12-26-12Party: Defendant Desir, Paul |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 01-19-13Party: Defendant Deerfield Palms Condo Assn Inc |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 12-26-12Party: Defendant Desir, Marie Carmelle |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 12-26-12Party: Defendant Desir, Pierre |
|
January 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Letter/Answer Defendant requesting more time to complete pending process w/loan modification w/bankParty: Defendant Desir, Pierre |
|
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid Payor: MORRIS HARDWICK SCHNEIDER ; Userid: CTS-mpreto ; Receipt: 20121YE1H006353; omments: CK#160072/160073 ;Amount: $906.00 |
|
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: MORRIS HARDWICK SCHNEIDER ; Userid: CTS-mpreto ; Receipt: 20121YE1H006353; omments: CK#160072/160073 ;Amount: $50.00 |
|
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Defendant Count > than 5 Payor: MORRIS HARDWICK SCHNEIDER ; Userid: CTS-mpreto ; Receipt: 20121YE1H006353; omments: CK#160072/160073 ;Amount: $2.50 |
|
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Value Claim Form | |
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Lis Pendens Fld & Rec |
|
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued tenant/ hb to runnerParty: Defendant Desir, Paul Defendant Desir, Pierre Defendant Desir, Marie Carmelle Defendant Deerfield Palms Condo Assn Inc |
|
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Refund Payor: MORRIS HARDWICK SCHNEIDER ; Userid: CTS-mpreto ; Receipt: 20121YE1H006353; omments: CK#160072/160073 ;Amount: $8.50 |
|
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Petition | |
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet |