Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Deutsche Bank Nat Tr Company Plaintiff vs. Knox Phillips, et al Defendant
On November 30, 2012 a real prop non-homestead res fore - >$50k - <$250,000 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 30, 2012
Last Refreshed
March 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Real Prop Non-Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Judgment of Foreclosure
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title | |
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Title Issued Sent to Recording | |
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet | |
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale | |
March 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Foreclosure Sale Fee Payor: Aldridge Connors ; Userid: CTS- ; Receipt: 20141RA1A007669; ;Amount: $70.00 |
|
March 11, 2014 | hearing | Foreclosure Sale | |
March 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication MARCH 11, 2014 |
|
February 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney sale date of March 11, 2014 |
|
February 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Sale to be Issued by Attorney | |
February 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
February 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Foreclosure Form | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Affidavit OF NON-MILITARY SERVICEParty: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank Nat Tr Company |
|
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Non-Military Affidavit SERVICE |
|
December 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address Party: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank Nat Tr Company |
|
December 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Februag 3, 2014 at 1:30pm RM 519 |
|
October 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTSParty: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank Nat Tr Company |
|
October 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default & Default AGAINST , UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KNOX PHILLIPS NKA TERELLA PHILLIPSParty: Defendant Phillips, Knox Defendant Deutsche Bank Nat Tr Co |
|
October 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES |
|
October 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic UNKNOWN TENANT # 1 , UNKNOWN TENANT # 2 , UNKNOWN TENANT # 3 , UNKNOWN TENANT # 4 |
|
October 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Attorney Fees AND COSTS |
|
October 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Amounts Due AND OWING |
|
October 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Non-Military Affidavit | |
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 1/30/2013 on unknown spouse of Knox Phillips (Terella Phillips) |
|
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved ukn tenant #2 |
|
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 12/4/12Party: Defendant Parkside Towers Condo Assn Inc |
|
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 1/30/13Party: Defendant Phillips, Knox |
|
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 12/18/12Party: Defendant Deutsche Bank Nat Tr Co |
|
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved tenant #1 |
|
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Parkside Towers Condo Assn Inc |
|
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Unknown spouse of Knox Phillips; Unknown tenant (1); Unknown tenant (2)Party: Defendant Phillips, Knox Defendant Parkside Towers Condo Assn Inc Defendant Deutsche Bank Nat Tr Co |
|
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Defendant Count > than 5 Payor: ALDRIGE CONNOR ; Userid: CTS-adaniels ; Receipt: 20121YE1D008000; omments: CK 64720 S-6 LP HB TO PS ;Amount: $7.50 |
|
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid Payor: ALDRIGE CONNOR ; Userid: CTS-adaniels ; Receipt: 20121YE1D008000; omments: CK 64720 S-6 LP HB TO PS ;Amount: $906.00 |
|
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Petition | |
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: ALDRIGE CONNOR ; Userid: CTS-adaniels ; Receipt: 20121YE1D008000; omments: CK 64720 S-6 LP HB TO PS ;Amount: $60.00 |
|
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Lis Pendens Fld & Rec |
|
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Value Claim Form | |
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses |