Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
U S Bank NA Plaintiff vs. Nora Tamayo, et al Defendant
On November 28, 2012 a real prop non-homestead res fore =/>$250,000 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 28, 2012
Last Refreshed
March 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Category
Real Prop Non-Homestead Res Fore =/>$250,000
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
February 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint Party: Defendant Savanna Maintenance Assn Inc |
|
January 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Town Foundation Inc |
|
January 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served Unknown Tenant #1 |
|
January 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved Uknown Tenant #2 |
|
January 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 11/29/12Party: Defendant Tamayo, Nora |
|
January 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 11/29/12Party: Defendant Tamayo, Gustavo |
|
January 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 11/30/12Party: Defendant MERS Inc |
|
January 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 12/5/12Party: Defendant Savanna Maintenance Assn Inc |
|
January 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 11/29/12Party: Defendant Town Foundation Inc |
|
December 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Answer Party: Defendant Tamayo, Nora Defendant Tamayo, Gustavo |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Lis Pendens Fld & Rec |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Unknown Tenant 1; Unknown Tenant 2Party: Defendant Tamayo, Nora Defendant Tamayo, Gustavo Defendant MERS Inc Defendant Savanna Maintenance Assn Inc Defendant Town Foundation Inc |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid Payor: DUGGAR ESQ, JASON ; Userid: CTS-adaniels ; Receipt: 20121YE1D007942; omments: CK 90352 S-6 LP HB TO PS ;Amount: $1,906.00 |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Petition | |
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Refund * * * V O I D * * * CTS: adaniels - ; Receipt: 20121YE1D007943; ;Amount: ($19.50) |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Refund Payor: DUGGAR ESQ, JASON ; Userid: CTS-adaniels ; Receipt: 20121YE1D007942; omments: CK 90352 S-6 LP HB TO PS ;Amount: $19.50 |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee * * * V O I D * * * CTS: adaniels - ; Receipt: 20121YE1D007943; ;Amount: ($60.00) |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Refund Payor: DUGGAR ESQ, JASON ; Userid: CTS-adaniels ; Receipt: 20121YE1D007944; omments: CK 90352 S-7 LP HB TO PS ;Amount: $7.00 |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid Payor: DUGGAR ESQ, JASON ; Userid: CTS-adaniels ; Receipt: 20121YE1D007944; omments: CK 90352 S-7 LP HB TO PS ;Amount: $1,906.00 |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid * * * V O I D * * * CTS: adaniels - ; Receipt: 20121YE1D007943; ;Amount: ($1,906.00) |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: DUGGAR ESQ, JASON ; Userid: CTS-adaniels ; Receipt: 20121YE1D007942; omments: CK 90352 S-6 LP HB TO PS ;Amount: $60.00 |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: DUGGAR ESQ, JASON ; Userid: CTS-adaniels ; Receipt: 20121YE1D007944; omments: CK 90352 S-7 LP HB TO PS ;Amount: $70.00 |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Defendant Count > than 5 * * * V O I D * * * CTS: adaniels - ; Receipt: 20121YE1D007943; ;Amount: ($2.50) |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Value Claim Form | |
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Defendant Count > than 5 Payor: DUGGAR ESQ, JASON ; Userid: CTS-adaniels ; Receipt: 20121YE1D007944; omments: CK 90352 S-7 LP HB TO PS ;Amount: $5.00 |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Defendant Count > than 5 Payor: DUGGAR ESQ, JASON ; Userid: CTS-adaniels ; Receipt: 20121YE1D007942; omments: CK 90352 S-6 LP HB TO PS ;Amount: $2.50 |