Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Deutsche Bank Nat Tr Co Plaintiff vs. William J Kecskemethy, et al Defendant
On November 28, 2012 a real prop non-homestead res fore - >$50k - <$250,000 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 28, 2012
Last Refreshed
March 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Category
Real Prop Non-Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Bankruptcy
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Returned Served | |
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Issued to Process Server hb to runner: to put Aegis Properties of South Florida LLC |
|
November 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Check Paid to Ronald R Wolfe & Assoc pl trust acct/mailed to same; cert dated 11/19/13; $73,200.00/ ct reg |
|
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title | |
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursements | |
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Title Issued Sent to Recording AEGIS PROPERTIES OF SOUTH FLORIDA, LLC |
|
November 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Foreclosure Clerk's Fee Payor: Joesph Berg ; Userid: CTS- ; Receipt: 20131RA1A022875; ;Amount: $1,105.50 |
|
November 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Foreclosure Bid Payor: Joesph Berg ; Userid: CTS- ; Receipt: 20131RA1A022875; ;Amount: $73,200.00 |
|
November 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale | |
November 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet | |
November 05, 2013 | hearing | Foreclosure Sale | |
November 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Foreclosure Sale Fee Payor: Jodi Stohlmann ; Userid: CTS- ; Receipt: 20131RA1A022606; ;Amount: $70.00 |
|
October 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication SALE DATE 11/5/13 |
|
September 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney | |
September 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Sale to be Issued by Attorney | |
August 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
August 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Foreclosure Form | |
August 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
August 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Form Disposed by Judge |
|
July 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing August 29, 2013 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 518 |
|
July 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Default Party: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank Nat Tr Co |
|
July 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default against dfs,WILLIAM J. KECSKEMETHY MARIA PILAR KECSKEMETHY TENANT #1 N/K/A NELLY VELASCO TENANT #2 NK/A ANGEL VAQUIParty: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank Nat Tr Co |
|
July 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing ofattached Bankruptcy ReliefParty: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank Nat Tr Co |
|
May 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing ATTACHED COPY OF NOTEParty: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank Nat Tr Co |
|
May 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing ATTACHED COPY OF MORTGAGEParty: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank Nat Tr Co |
|
May 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Affidavit Party: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank Nat Tr Co |
|
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment INCLUDING A HEARING TO TAX ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AND REFORMATION OF MORTGAGEParty: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank Nat Tr Co |
|
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Firm Name Change | |
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Attorney Fees OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS |
|
April 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Affidavit of Military Status for TENANT #1 N/K/A NELLY VELASCOParty: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank Nat Tr Co |
|
April 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Affidavit of Military Status for THE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WILLIAM J. KECSKEMETHYParty: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank Nat Tr Co |
|
April 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Firm Name Change to RONALD R. WOLFE & ASSOCIATES, P.L |
|
April 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Affidavit of Military Status for MARIA PILAR KECSKEMETHYParty: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank Nat Tr Co |
|
April 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Affidavit of Military Status and Data Manpower for WILLIAM J. KECSKEMETHYParty: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank Nat Tr Co |
|
April 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Affidavit of Military Status for TENANT #2 N/K/A ANGEL VAQULParty: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank Nat Tr Co |
|
April 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Affidavit Party: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank Nat Tr Co |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 12/1/12 tenant #2 nka angel vaqui |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 12/1/12Party: Defendant Kecskemethy, William J |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 12/1/12 unknown spouse of william j kecskemethy |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 12/1/12 tenant #1 nka nelly velasco |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 12/1/12Party: Defendant Kecskemethy, Maria Pilar |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved unknown spouse of maria pilar kecskemethy |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: RONALD R WOLFE ASSOC ; Userid: CTS-mpreto ; Receipt: 20121YE1C007666; omments: CK#1168406 ;Amount: $60.00 |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Value Claim Form | |
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Lis Pendens Fld & Rec |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Defendant Count > than 5 Payor: RONALD R WOLFE ASSOC ; Userid: CTS-mpreto ; Receipt: 20121YE1C007666; omments: CK#1168406 ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid Payor: RONALD R WOLFE ASSOC ; Userid: CTS-mpreto ; Receipt: 20121YE1C007666; omments: CK#1168406 ;Amount: $906.00 |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued unknown spouse of William Kecskemethy and Maria Kecskemethy, tenant 1 and 2Party: Defendant Kecskemethy, William J Defendant Kecskemethy, Maria Pilar |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Petition | |
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet |