Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Shirley Cox Plaintiff vs. Autozone Stores Inc, et al Defendant
On November 05, 2012 an auto negligence case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 05, 2012
Last Refreshed
October 06, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
, Jr.;Category
Auto Negligence
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Closed
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Response to Request for Production
Date: Aug 31, 2015Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Aug 31, 2015Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Aug 31, 2015Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Aug 31, 2015Response to Request for Production
Date: Aug 25, 2015Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: Aug 14, 2015Response to Request for Admissions
Date: Aug 06, 2015Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Jul 31, 2015Agreed Order
Date: Jul 30, 2015Request for Admissions
Date: Jul 16, 2015Notice of Propounding Interrogatories
Date: Jul 16, 2015Request for Production
Date: Jul 16, 2015Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Jul 14, 2015Amended
Date: Jul 07, 2015Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: Jul 07, 2015Agreed Order
Date: Jul 01, 2015Motion to Strike
Date: Jun 30, 2015Request for Production
Date: Jun 17, 2015Amended Complaint
Date: Jun 09, 2015Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: Jun 09, 2015Notice of Interrogatories
Date: May 28, 2015Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: Nov 18, 2014Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: Jun 23, 2014Motion for Substitution of Counsel
Date: May 20, 2014Response to Request for Copies
Date: Mar 19, 2014Response to Request for Copies
Date: Mar 18, 2014Response to Request for Copies
Date: Feb 26, 2014Not of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Under Rule 1.351
Date: Dec 09, 2013Response to Request for Copies
Date: Nov 27, 2013Response to Request for Copies
Date: Sep 16, 2013Response to Request for Copies
Date: Jul 26, 2013Response to Request for Copies
Date: Jul 24, 2013Response to Request for Copies
Date: Jun 14, 2013Response to Request for Copies
Date: Apr 11, 2013Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition JOCELYN J. CABALLERO |
|
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production TO SUPPLEMENTAL REQUESTParty: Plaintiff Cox, Shirley |
|
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories TO COLLATERAL SOURCE INTERROGATORIESParty: Plaintiff Cox, Shirley |
|
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories TO EXPERT MEDICAL INTERROGATORIESParty: Plaintiff Cox, Shirley |
|
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories TO SUPPLMENTALParty: Plaintiff Cox, Shirley |
|
August 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production Party: Defendant Caballero, Jocelyn J |
|
August 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories Party: Defendant Caballero, Jocelyn J |
|
August 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Reply to Affirmative Defenses Party: Plaintiff Cox, Shirley |
|
August 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Admissions Party: Defendant Caballero, Jocelyn J |
|
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Caballero, Jocelyn J |
|
July 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE TRIAL ORDER AND TO REMOVE CASE FROM TRIAL DOCKET/ granted |
|
July 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing/Affidavit of Service Returned Served 07/25/2015Party: Defendant Caballero, Jocelyn J |
|
July 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions TO DEFENDANT, JOCELYN J. CABALLEROParty: Plaintiff Cox, Shirley |
|
July 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Propounding Interrogatories TO THE DEFENDANT, JOCELYN J. CABALLEROParty: Defendant Caballero, Jocelyn J |
|
July 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request for Production TO DEFENDANT, JOCELYN J. CABALLEROParty: Plaintiff Cox, Shirley |
|
July 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Unavailability Party: Attorney Cosio, Eduardo |
|
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Autozone Stores Inc |
|
July 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: ROBERT C. ROGERS, Jr\. ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A097421; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
July 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance - On Amended Party: Defendant Caballero, Jocelyn J |
|
July 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Amended COMPLAINTParty: Plaintiff Cox, Shirley |
|
July 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion for Enlargement of Time Party: Plaintiff Cox, Shirley |
|
July 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Thursday, July 30,2015 @8:45 a.m |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT/ DEFENDANT HAVE 20 DAYS FROM THIS ORDER TO FILE AN ANSWER |
|
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike TRIAL ORDER AND TO REMOVE CASE FROM TRIAL DOCKETParty: Defendant Autozone Stores Inc |
|
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Party: Defendant Autozone Stores Inc |
|
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint Party: Plaintiff Cox, Shirley |
|
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 06/17/15 @ 8:45 AM RM 1050 |
|
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference Order TRIAL PERIOD Commencing September 14, 2015 . This is a (3 ) week calendar. CALL OF THE CALENDAR ANDPRETRIAL CONFERENCE: (09/08/2015 at 10:30 AM; Rm 1050 |
|
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion for Leave to Amend TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINTParty: Plaintiff Cox, Shirley |
|
May 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatories Party: Defendant Autozone Stores Inc |
|
May 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs Party: Defendant Autozone Stores Inc |
|
March 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Jamie Abernathy |
|
November 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement Party: Defendant Autozone Stores Inc |
|
September 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Charging Lien Party: Plaintiff Cox, Shirley |
|
June 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order for Substitution of Counsel granted / |
|
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion for Substitution of Counsel ROBERT C. ROGERS, Jr\., ESQ. Florida Bar No.: 274828Party: Plaintiff Cox, Shirley |
|
March 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Copies Party: Defendant Autozone Stores Inc |
|
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Copies Party: Defendant Autozone Stores Inc |
|
February 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Copies Party: Defendant Autozone Stores Inc |
|
February 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Compliance Party: Defendant Autozone Stores Inc |
|
December 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Not of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Under Rule 1.351 Party: Defendant Autozone Stores Inc |
|
November 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Copies Party: Defendant Autozone Stores Inc |
|
November 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Unavailability Party: Attorney Feiler, Michael B |
|
September 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Copies Party: Defendant Autozone Stores Inc |
|
July 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Copies Party: Defendant Autozone Stores Inc |
|
July 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Copies Party: Defendant Autozone Stores Inc |
|
June 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Copies Defendant, LEMUS IRRIGATION, INC |
|
April 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Copies Party: Defendant Autozone Stores Inc |
|
April 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Compliance BY DEFENDANT |
|
April 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Compliance EDUARDO COSIO ESQ |
|
April 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Compliance BY DEFENDANT |
|
March 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to serve subp under rule 1.351 for prod of docs & things w/o depo |
|
March 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate in compliance by df; Eduardo Cosio Esq |
|
March 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to serve subp under rule 1.351 for prod of docs & things w/o depo / Eduardo Cosio, Esq |
|
February 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351) Party: Plaintiff Cox, Shirley |
|
February 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to serve subp under rule 1.351 for production of documents and things w/o depo/ Eduardo Cosio Esq |
|
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of answers to df's interrogsParty: Plaintiff Cox, Shirley |
|
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production Party: Plaintiff Cox, Shirley |
|
February 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories Party: Defendant Autozone Stores Inc |
|
February 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Unavailability Apr 8, 2013 through Apr 14, 2013Party: Plaintiff Cox, Shirley |
|
February 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition (amended) Shirley Cox |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Party: Defendant Autozone Stores Inc |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Autozone Stores Inc |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs Party: Defendant Autozone Stores Inc |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Shirley Cox |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Objection to pl's interrogsParty: Defendant Autozone Stores Inc |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Party: Defendant Autozone Stores Inc |
|
January 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 12/03/12 Autozone Stores Inc |
|
November 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: FEILER, MICHAEL ; Userid: CTS-dlewis ; Receipt: 20121YE1A008008; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
November 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: FEILER, MICHAEL ; Userid: CTS-dlewis ; Receipt: 20121YE1A008008; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
November 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
November 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Interrogatories & Notice of Service | |
November 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued mbParty: Defendant Autozone Stores Inc |
|
November 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet |