Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Springcrest Condo Assn Inc Plaintiff vs. Alexander Milic Defendant
On November 21, 2012 a real prop other - $0 - $50,000 case was filed by Springcrest Condo Assn Inc, represented by Meanley, Brian T, Esq., against Milic, Alexander, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Phillips, Carol-Lisa presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 21, 2012
Last Refreshed
March 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Judge
Hon. Phillips, Carol-Lisa
Category
Real Prop Other - $0 - $50,000
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
General Property
Status
Judgment of Foreclosure
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title | |
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale | |
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Foreclosure Sale Fee Payor: Charles Otto ; Userid: CTS- ; Receipt: 20131RA1A005599; ;Amount: $70.00 |
|
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet | |
March 14, 2013 | hearing | Foreclosure Sale | |
March 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Of Additional Maintenance Due |
|
March 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication STRALEY & OTTO, P.A. |
|
February 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
February 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Court Hearing Worksheet | |
February 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Copies Mailed to all Parties; FJ/NSDB | |
February 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Sale | |
January 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Reasonable Attorney Fees | |
January 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Final Judgment of ForeclosureParty: Plaintiff Springcrest Condo Assn Inc |
|
January 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Of Lien Fees and Costs |
|
January 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Attorney Fees | |
January 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 02-07-2013 @ 08:45Am Rm1020B |
|
January 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Indebtedness | |
January 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default & Default Party: Defendant Milic, Alexander |
|
January 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Non-Military Affidavit Party: Defendant Milic, Alexander |
|
November 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 11/23/12Party: Defendant Milic, Alexander |
|
November 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
November 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Lis Pendens Fld & Rec |
|
November 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Party: Defendant Milic, Alexander |
|
November 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Petition | |
November 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: MEANLEY ESQ, BRIAN T ; Userid: CTS-rsukhlall ; Receipt: 20121YE1B005702; omments: CK#52596/S-1/HB PS ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
November 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Value Claim Form | |
November 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid Payor: MEANLEY ESQ, BRIAN T ; Userid: CTS-rsukhlall ; Receipt: 20121YE1B005702; omments: CK#52596/S-1/HB PS ;Amount: $401.00 |