Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Bank Of America NA Plaintiff vs. Elizabeth Altman Defendant
On November 15, 2012 a real prop non-homestead res fore - >$50k - <$250,000 case was filed by Bank Of America Na, represented by Green, Kerry, Esq., against Altman, Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 15, 2012
Last Refreshed
March 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Real Prop Non-Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Directions to the Clerk | |
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Lack of Prosecution | |
March 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order Def's motion to dismiss with prejudice and discharge lis pendens, denied, def. shall file an answer /in 20 days |
|
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing (attached) Non-Resident Cost BondParty: Plaintiff Bank Of America NA |
|
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Non-resident Cost Bond Payor: ALDRIDGE CONNORS LLP ; Userid: CTS-kwhite ; Receipt: 20131YE1N000454; omments: FILED 2/28/13 ;Amount: $100.00 |
|
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Refund Payor: ALDRIDGE CONNORS LLP ; Userid: CTS-kwhite ; Receipt: 20131YE1N000454; omments: FILED 2/28/13 ;Amount: $8.00 |
|
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Aldridge / Connors LLP |
|
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 03/07/13 at 8:45am |
|
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved Unknown Spouse of Elizabeth Altman |
|
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 11/19/12 Unknown Tenant # 1 NKA Cheryl Prather |
|
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved Party: Defendant Altman, Elizabeth |
|
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 11/19/12 Unknown Tenant # 2 NKA KIm Hines |
|
December 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss with prejudice and discharge lis pendens/ defs, Janis S Koenig, Kimberly Hines and Cheryl M Prather,by atty,C Glenn Leonard |
|
November 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid Payor: ALDRIDGE CONNORS LLP ; Userid: CTS-mpreto ; Receipt: 20121YE1C007381; omments: CK#63517 ;Amount: $906.00 |
|
November 15, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
November 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: ALDRIDGE CONNORS LLP ; Userid: CTS-mpreto ; Receipt: 20121YE1C007381; omments: CK#63517 ;Amount: $40.00 |
|
November 15, 2012 | Docket Event | Petition | |
November 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Defendant Count > than 5 Payor: ALDRIDGE CONNORS LLP ; Userid: CTS-mpreto ; Receipt: 20121YE1C007381; omments: CK#63517 ;Amount: $5.00 |
|
November 15, 2012 | Docket Event | Value Claim Form | |
November 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Lis Pendens Fld & Rec |
|
November 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued unknown spouse of Elizabeth Altman, unknown tenant 1 and 2 / hb psParty: Defendant Altman, Elizabeth |
|
November 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Party: Attorney Green, Kerry, ESQ. |