Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Bank Of America NA Plaintiff vs. Brenda Rose Bowers, et al Defendant
On November 08, 2012 a real prop non-homestead res fore - >$50k - <$250,000 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 08, 2012
Last Refreshed
March 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Real Prop Non-Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Order Resetting
Date: Aug 11, 2014Order Setting
Date: Jun 12, 2014Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Resetting TRIAL AND ISSUANCE OF SHOW CAUSE ORDER: 8/19/14 9:00AM RM 510 |
|
August 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order of Referral to General Magistrate & SCHEDULING ORDER: NON-JURY TRIAL: 8/19/14 9:00AM RM 510 |
|
July 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order of Referral to General Magistrate & SCHEDULING ORDER NON-JURY TRIAL: 7/30/14 9:00AM RM 517 |
|
June 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Setting NJ TRIAL 7/30/14 |
|
June 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Setting NON-JURY FORECLOSURE TRIAL AND PRETRIAL PROCEDURES/ 07/30/2014 TIME 9:00A.M RM 518 |
|
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 11/28/12 unknown spouse of brenda rose bowers |
|
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 11/28/12Party: Defendant Johnson, Bessie Rose |
|
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved unknown spouse of bessie rose johnson |
|
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 11/28/12Party: Defendant Bowers, Brenda Rose |
|
December 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved Unk Tenant #2 |
|
December 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved Unk Tenant #1 |
|
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 11/13/12Party: Defendant Bank of America NA |
|
November 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Refund Payor: BUTLER HOSCH PA ; Userid: CTS-mpreto ; Receipt: 20121YE1C007259; omments: CK#14315 ;Amount: $6.50 |
|
November 08, 2012 | Docket Event | Value Claim Form | |
November 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid Payor: BUTLER HOSCH PA ; Userid: CTS-mpreto ; Receipt: 20121YE1C007259; omments: CK#14315 ;Amount: $906.00 |
|
November 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: BUTLER HOSCH PA ; Userid: CTS-mpreto ; Receipt: 20121YE1C007259; omments: CK#14315 ;Amount: $70.00 |
|
November 08, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses | |
November 08, 2012 | Docket Event | Petition | |
November 08, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
November 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Unknow Spouse of Brenda Rose Bowers; Unknown Tenant 1; Unknown Tenant IIParty: Defendant Bank of America NA Defendant Johnson, Bessie Rose Defendant Bowers, Brenda Rose |
|
November 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Defendant Count > than 5 Payor: BUTLER HOSCH PA ; Userid: CTS-mpreto ; Receipt: 20121YE1C007259; omments: CK#14315 ;Amount: $7.50 |
|
November 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Lis Pendens Fld & Rec |