Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Bank OF New York Mellon Plaintiff vs. Gregory A Harold, et al Defendant
On November 07, 2012 a real prop non-homestead res fore =/>$250,000 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 07, 2012
Last Refreshed
March 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Real Prop Non-Homestead Res Fore =/>$250,000
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Order to Show Cause
Date: Jul 07, 2014Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause LACK OF PROSECUTION 06-30-14 9:45 am rm 970 |
|
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Directions to the Clerk A Voluntary Dismissal Was Entered on 6/30/14 |
|
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Lack of Prosecution FLORIDA RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.420(e |
|
January 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order on df's mot for ext of time/granted; df has 30days to file response |
|
January 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served (12/13/12) a/k/a Jill HaroldParty: Defendant Harold, Jill R |
|
January 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served (11/08/12) Unk Tenant #1 in Possession of the Property n/k/a Dawn Franks-Campi |
|
January 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved Unk Tenant #2 in Possesion of the Property |
|
January 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served (11/09/12)Party: Defendant Branch Banking and Trust Co |
|
January 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served (12/13/12) a/k/a Gregory HaroldParty: Defendant Harold, Gregory A |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Harold, Gregory A Defendant Harold, Jill R |
|
November 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Value Claim Form | |
November 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Unknown Tenant 1; Unknown Tenant 2Party: Defendant Harold, Gregory A Defendant Harold, Jill R Defendant Branch Banking and Trust Co |
|
November 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Petition | |
November 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid Payor: MARINOSCI LAW GROUP PC ; Userid: CTS-mpreto ; Receipt: 20121YE1C007205; omments: CK#88847 ;Amount: $1,906.00 |
|
November 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
November 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: MARINOSCI LAW GROUP PC ; Userid: CTS-mpreto ; Receipt: 20121YE1C007205; omments: CK#88847 ;Amount: $50.00 |
|
November 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Lis Pendens Fld & Rec |