Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Carol Luke Plaintiff vs. Rupert's Boonoonoonoos, Inc Defendant
On November 05, 2012 a neg - negligent security case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Perlman, Sandra presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 05, 2012
Last Refreshed
October 06, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
, Jr.;Category
Neg - Negligent Security
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Negligent Security
Status
Settlement
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Notice
Date: Mar 20, 2017Request for Production
Date: Feb 17, 2017Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: Feb 17, 2017Request for Copies
Date: Feb 15, 2017Request for Copies
Date: Feb 14, 2017Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: Feb 14, 2017Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: Feb 13, 2017Notice of Compliance
Date: Feb 13, 2017Request for Copies
Date: Feb 10, 2017Response to Request for Production
Date: Jan 27, 2017Supplemental Request to Produce
Date: Jan 10, 2017Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: Jan 04, 2017Expert Witness List
Date: Jan 03, 2017Notice of Mediation
Date: Dec 29, 2016Confirmation of Selection for Mediators
Date: Dec 07, 2016Agreed Order
Date: Dec 05, 2016Request for Production
Date: Dec 02, 2016Response to Request for Production
Date: Dec 01, 2016Joint Motion
Date: Dec 01, 2016Response to Request for Production
Date: Nov 30, 2016Order Granting Motion
Date: Nov 08, 2016Request for Production
Date: Oct 27, 2016Request for Production
Date: Oct 26, 2016Joint Motion
Date: Oct 20, 2016Expert Witness List
Date: Oct 05, 2016Expert Witness List
Date: Oct 05, 2016Response to Request for Production
Date: Sep 21, 2016Request for Production
Date: Aug 22, 2016Order
Date: May 25, 2016Order
Date: May 05, 2016Order
Date: Apr 27, 2016Order
Date: Apr 08, 2016Order
Date: Apr 08, 2016Request for Production
Date: Feb 12, 2016Request for Production
Date: Feb 12, 2016Request for Production
Date: Feb 12, 2016Request for Production
Date: Feb 12, 2016Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: Sep 16, 2014Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Jul 16, 2014Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Jul 16, 2014Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Jul 16, 2014Copy
Date: Jun 26, 2014Agreed Order
Date: Jun 26, 2014Motion to Amend Complaint
Date: Jun 25, 2014Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: Jun 24, 2014Notice of Filing
Date: May 06, 2014Notice of Filing
Date: May 02, 2014Response to Request for Production
Date: May 02, 2014Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: Apr 21, 2014Response to Request for Admissions
Date: Apr 18, 2014Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: Apr 16, 2014Interrogatories
Date: Mar 19, 2014Request for Admissions
Date: Mar 19, 2014Request for Production of Documents
Date: Mar 19, 2014Interrogatories
Date: Mar 18, 2014Request for Admissions
Date: Mar 18, 2014Request for Production of Documents
Date: Mar 18, 2014Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: Feb 28, 2014Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: Aug 22, 2013Response to Request to Produce
Date: Aug 08, 2013Agreed Order
Date: Jul 22, 2013Request for Production
Date: May 23, 2013Interrogatories
Date: May 23, 2013Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice OF SETTLEMENT |
|
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
February 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
February 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
February 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
February 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Compliance Requests for copies dated February 10,2017Party: Defendant Marivest Inc |
|
February 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
February 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certificate OF ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATIONParty: Defendant Dacar Management, LLC Defendant Regina, Inc Defendant Marivest Inc |
|
February 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certificate OF ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATIONParty: Defendant Marivest Inc Defendant Dacar Management, LLC Defendant Regina, Inc |
|
January 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
January 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Supplemental Request to Produce | |
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Disclosure of Expert Witness | |
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Expert Witness List | |
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Confirmation of Selection for Mediators | |
December 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order on Joint Motion to Extend Mediation Deadline is Granted to 2/17/17 |
|
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Joint Motion TO EXTEND MEDIATION DEADLINE |
|
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
November 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
November 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition NELLY CLAVERO |
|
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Video Deposition Carol Luke |
|
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Resetting Trial on the Jury/Non Jury Calendar Commencing 4/3/17, Calendar Call Will be 3/24/17 9:30 AM Ctrm 960 |
|
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Video Deposition Chief Constance Stanley |
|
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion | |
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR STATUS CONFERENCE AND/OR CONTINUANCEParty: Plaintiff Luke, Carol |
|
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Emergency Motion FOR STATUS CONFERENCE AND/OR CONTINUANCEParty: Plaintiff Luke, Carol |
|
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Party: Defendant Marivest Inc |
|
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs Party: Defendant Marivest Inc |
|
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Party: Defendant Marivest Inc |
|
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Expert Interrogatories Party: Defendant Marivest Inc |
|
October 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Order On Case Management Conference | |
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Joint Motion Party: Plaintiff Luke, Carol |
|
October 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Management Conference | |
October 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Expert Witness List DEFENDANTS MARIVEST. INC.. DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS LIST IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE COURT'S PRETRIA ORDER |
|
October 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Expert Witness List | |
September 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
September 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
August 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Party: Defendant Marivest Inc |
|
August 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Expert Interrogatories Party: Defendant Marivest Inc |
|
May 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call-Order Resetting Trial Calendar Call will be 12-02-2016 9:30 AM in Courtroom 940, trial 01-03-17 |
|
May 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Order | |
May 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order from April 18th , 2016 on Record Activity of Lack of Prosecution |
|
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order APPOINTING MEDIATOR/Jay Spechler |
|
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial 08-19-2016 9:30 AM, RM 640 / TRIAL 9-19-16 / 5 DAYS JURY TRIAL |
|
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 05/25/2016 @ 8:45 A.M. /RM 940 |
|
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order To Set Trial Later |
|
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Finding Record Activity |
|
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request FOR RE-HEARING OF THE COURT'S APRIL 8, 2016 HEARING/STATUS CONFERENCE ON NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTIN/COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISSParty: Defendant Dacar Management, LLC Defendant Marivest Inc |
|
February 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Production SUPPLEMENTA/ L TO DEFENDANT, DACAR MANAGEMENT, LLCParty: Plaintiff Luke, Carol |
|
February 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Production SUPPLEMENTAL/ TO DEFENDANT, MARIVEST, INCParty: Plaintiff Luke, Carol |
|
February 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Production SUPPLEMENTAL/ TO DEFENDANT, REGINA, INCParty: Plaintiff Luke, Carol |
|
February 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Production SUPPLEMENTAL/ TO DEFENDANT, DANNY GUILLAUME d/b/a FRESH CUT BARBERSHOPParty: Plaintiff Luke, Carol |
|
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss/Notice of Hearing by Judge April 8th 9:30 AM RM 940 |
|
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses (AMENDED)/ TODD J MICHAELS ESQ |
|
October 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation of Deposition of the Person with the most knowledge - RUPERT' S Corporate Rep./Security |
|
October 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default & Default AGAINSTParty: Defendant Rupert's Boonoonoonoos, Inc |
|
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses AMENDED/TODD J MICHAELS ESQ |
|
September 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation of Deposition of the Person with the most knowledge Corp. Rep./Security Carlos Garcia Velez of REGNA, INC. AND DACAR MANAGEMENT, LLC |
|
September 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Affidavit Affidavit of Carlos Garcia-Velez in support of Defendants' Motion for Protective OrderParty: Defendant Marivest Inc Defendant Dacar Management, LLC Defendant Regina, Inc |
|
September 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion for Protective Order AS TO CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE DEPOSITIONSParty: Defendant Regina, Inc Defendant Dacar Management, LLC Defendant Marivest Inc |
|
July 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Return of Service Served 7/10/14Party: Defendant Rupert's Boonoonoonoos, Inc |
|
July 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Defendant, MARIVEST, INC |
|
July 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Defendant, DACAR MANAGEMENT, LLC |
|
July 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Defendant, REGINA, INC |
|
July 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 06/27/14Party: Defendant Dacar Management, LLC |
|
July 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 6/27/14Party: Defendant Regina, Inc |
|
June 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance - On Amended By serving: Carlos Garcia-Velez as Registered Agent |
|
June 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: TODD J. MICHAELS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20141FA1A087070; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
June 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance - On Amended By serving: Tobin & Reyes, P.A., as Registered Agents |
|
June 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance - On Amended By serving: RUPERT SIMPSON, as Registered Agents |
|
June 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Copy UNOPPOSED AGREED ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S FIRST MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT |
|
June 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order UNOPPOSED AGREED ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S FIRST MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, grante / preexisting dfs 20 days |
|
June 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion to Amend Complaint Party: Plaintiff Luke, Carol |
|
June 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion for Leave to Amend Party: Plaintiff Luke, Carol |
|
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIESParty: Defendant Marivest Inc |
|
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIESParty: Defendant Marivest Inc |
|
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production Party: Defendant Marivest Inc |
|
May 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Certificate of No Objection Party: Defendant Marivest Inc |
|
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Production From Non-Party Party: Defendant Marivest Inc |
|
April 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Admissions Party: Defendant Marivest Inc |
|
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Production From Non-Party Party: Defendant Marivest Inc |
|
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance AS COUNSEL OF RECORDParty: Plaintiff Luke, Carol |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served | |
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Subpoena Duces Tecum w/o Deposition served |
|
March 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF THE CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE OF DEFENDANT MARIVEST, INCParty: Plaintiff Luke, Carol |
|
March 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Interrogatories FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT MARIVEST, INCParty: Plaintiff Luke, Carol |
|
March 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions FIRSTParty: Plaintiff Luke, Carol |
|
March 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Production of Documents FIRSTParty: Plaintiff Luke, Carol |
|
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Interrogatories NOTICE OF FILING INITIAL INTERROGATORIES UPON PLAINTIFF, CAROL LUKE, AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF HE ESTATE OF CONRAD LUKEParty: Defendant Marivest Inc |
|
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Subpoena duces Tecum Without Deposition |
|
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Subpoena Duces Tucem Without Deposition |
|
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Subpoena Duces Tucem Without Deposition Served |
|
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served | |
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions 1ST TO DEFT MARIVEST INC |
|
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Production of Documents FIRST TO DEFT MARIVEST INCParty: Plaintiff Luke, Carol |
|
March 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Certificate of No Objection Party: Defendant Marivest Inc |
|
February 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
February 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Re-Notice of Taking Deposition KAREN LUKE |
|
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Subpoena served |
|
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Danny Guillaume, Karen Luke |
|
October 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition OF Carol Luke; Nancy Luke; Leroy Forbes |
|
October 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Unavailability Douglas B. Melamed |
|
October 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served | |
October 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service 09/04/13 Hand Car Wash |
|
September 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Certificate of No Objection | |
August 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice OF WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL OF RECORDParty: Plaintiff Luke, Carol |
|
August 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
August 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Response to Request to Produce Party: Defendant Guillaume, Dany |
|
August 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing Party: Defendant Marivest Inc Defendant Guillaume, Dany |
|
August 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Order ON DEFENDANT MARIVEST'S EX-PARTE MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT GUILLAUME'S RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY/GRANED; 10 DAYS |
|
August 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Motion TO COMPEL DEFENDANT GUILLAUME'S RESPONSES TO DISCOVERYParty: Defendant Marivest Inc |
|
July 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S SECOND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE/ granted in part; see file fo specifics |
|
July 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Availability NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITYParty: Defendant Marivest Inc |
|
May 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Production TO DANNY GUILLAUME D/B/A FRESH CUT BARBERSHOPParty: Defendant Marivest Inc |
|
May 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Interrogatories TO DANY GUILLAUME D/B/A FRESH CUT BARBERSHOPParty: Defendant Marivest Inc |
|
March 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Denial & avoidance of Marivest Inc affirm defensesParty: Plaintiff Luke, Carol |
|
March 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Party: Attorney Chestnut, Christopher |
|
March 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 4/1/2013 @ 8:45 AM in room 990 |
|
February 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Guillaume, Dany |
|
February 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance as atty of recordParty: Attorney Butler, Lonworth, Jr\. Defendant Guillaume, Dany |
|
February 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Production to PlParty: Defendant Guillaume, Dany |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike df's 2nd affirmative defensesParty: Plaintiff Luke, Carol |
|
December 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved DBA Fresh Cut Barber ShopParty: Defendant Guillaume, Dany |
|
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Availability of atty D B Melamed Esq fb 150002Party: Defendant Marivest Inc |
|
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Marivest Inc |
|
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request for Production to PlParty: Defendant Marivest Inc |
|
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing initial interrogs upon Pl Carol Luke as personal rep of the est of Conrad LukeParty: Defendant Marivest Inc |
|
November 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance #15002Party: Defendant Marivest Inc |
|
November 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Party: Defendant Marivest Inc |
|
November 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 11/9/12Party: Defendant Marivest Inc |
|
November 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Party: Defendant Guillaume, Dany Defendant Marivest Inc |
|
November 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: CHESTNUT, CHRISTOPHER ; Userid: CTS-dlewis ; Receipt: 20121YE1A007580; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
November 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: CHESTNUT, CHRISTOPHER ; Userid: CTS-dlewis ; Receipt: 20121YE1A007580; ;Amount: $20.00 |
|
November 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Party: Defendant Marivest Inc Defendant Guillaume, Dany |
|
November 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
November 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Complaint |