Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Wells Fargo Bank NA Plaintiff vs. Josep Maria Llagostera, et al Defendant
On November 05, 2012 a real prop non-homestead res fore - >$50k - <$250,000 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 05, 2012
Last Refreshed
March 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Real Prop Non-Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Settlement
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Order to Show Cause
Date: Oct 22, 2014Order to Show Cause
Date: Oct 06, 2014Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing NOTICE OF INTENT TO FORECLOSEParty: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank NA |
|
October 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause --LOP // The court finds the matter has already been voluntarily dismissed by pl as a result of a sttlement between the parties (short sale) said dismissed was filed on 10/22/2014 |
|
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Form Dismissed Pursuant to Settlement- Before HearingParty: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank NA |
|
October 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause LACK OF PROSECUTION/ 10/22/14 @ 9:45am rm 970 |
|
September 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Lack of Prosecution LACK OF PROSECUTION |
|
July 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service Party: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank NA |
|
May 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic of dropping UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICEParty: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank NA |
|
April 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication | |
March 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Copy to Daily Business Review | |
March 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Copy Sent to Atty |
|
March 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Action Josep Maria Llagostera, Luz Nunez/ Return date 30 days from first proof of publication/ CDBR |
|
March 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Copies Mailed Last Known AddressParty: Defendant Llagostera, Josep Maria Defendant Nunez, Luz |
|
March 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Diligent Search Party: Defendant Llagostera, Josep Maria Defendant Nunez, Luz |
|
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved unknown tenants/owners |
|
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 11/6/12Party: Defendant Building Seven of Country Club Apartments at Bona Venture 32 Condo Assn Inc |
|
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 11/7/12Party: Defendant USA IRS |
|
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved Party: Defendant Nunez, Luz |
|
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved Party: Defendant Llagostera, Josep Maria |
|
December 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic UKN TENANTS W/O PRJ |
|
November 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid Payor: KASS SHULER PA ; Userid: CTS-mpreto ; Receipt: 20121YE1C007140; omments: CK#376455 ;Amount: $906.00 |
|
November 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Unknown tenants/OwnersParty: Defendant Llagostera, Josep Maria Defendant Nunez, Luz Defendant USA IRS Defendant Building Seven of Country Club Apartments at Bona Venture 32 Condo Assn Inc |
|
November 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: KASS SHULER PA ; Userid: CTS-mpreto ; Receipt: 20121YE1C007140; omments: CK#376455 ;Amount: $50.00 |
|
November 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Lis Pendens Fld & Rec |
|
November 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
November 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Value Claim Form | |
November 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Petition |