Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
HSBC Bank U S A, et al Plaintiff vs. Perry B Werbel, et al Defendant
On February 29, 2012 a real prop homestead res fore - >$50k - <$250,000 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 29, 2012
Last Refreshed
March 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Real Prop Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Summary Judgment
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Form -Dismissed before hrg |
|
October 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation of Hearing on October 22, 2012 @ 1:30pm for Motion for Summary Final Judgment is hereby Cancelled.Party: Attorney Okon, Robert C, ESQ. |
|
September 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 10/22/12 at 1:30pm rm 519 |
|
September 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses of Andrea L DeSoretz, Esq of Katzman Garfinkel & Berger |
|
September 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing copies of Promissory Note & Mtg / attachedParty: Plaintiff HSBC Bank U S A |
|
July 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Default againstParty: Plaintiff Paradise Gardens Section III Home Owner's Assoc, Inc |
|
July 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default df Paradise Gardens Section III Home Owner's Assoc, IncParty: Plaintiff HSBC Bank U S A |
|
June 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Final Judgment of fclsre & for atty's fees & costs / affidavits attachParty: Plaintiff HSBC Bank U S A |
|
May 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Party: Plaintiff HSBC Bank U S A |
|
May 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Default againstParty: Defendant Werbel, Perry B Defendant Werbel, Roseann Defendant Mortgage Electronic Reg Sys Inc |
|
May 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Non-Military Affidavit re: df; Perry B. Werbel and Roseann Werbel |
|
May 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic UNKNOWN TENANT #1 #2 AS PARTY DEFENDANTS |
|
March 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 3/12/12Party: Plaintiff Paradise Gardens Section III Home Owner's Assoc, Inc |
|
March 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint Party: Defendant Paradise Gardens Sect III Maint Assn Inc |
|
March 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 03/01/2012Party: Defendant Paradise Gardens Sect III Maint Assn Inc |
|
March 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved Unk tenant #2 |
|
March 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 03/01/2012Party: Defendant Werbel, Roseann |
|
March 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved Unk tenant #1 |
|
March 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 03/01/2012Party: Defendant Mortgage Electronic Reg Sys Inc |
|
March 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 03/01/2012Party: Defendant Werbel, Perry B |
|
February 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued unknown tenant 1 and 2 / hb psParty: Attorney Okon, Robert C, ESQ. Defendant Werbel, Perry B Defendant Werbel, Roseann Defendant Paradise Gardens Sect III Maint Assn Inc Defendant Mortgage Electronic Reg Sys Inc |
|
February 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: OKON ESQ, ROBERT C ; Userid: CTS-mmaryott ; Receipt: 20123YA3C000587; ;Amount: $70.00 |
|
February 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Lis Pendens Fld & Rec |
|
February 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid Payor: OKON ESQ, ROBERT C ; Userid: CTS-mmaryott ; Receipt: 20123YA3C000587; ;Amount: $906.00 |
|
February 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
February 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Defendant Count > than 5 Payor: OKON ESQ, ROBERT C ; Userid: CTS-mmaryott ; Receipt: 20123YA3C000587; ;Amount: $5.00 |
|
February 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Petition | |
February 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Value Claim Form | |
February 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued unknown tenant 1 and 2 / hb psParty: Defendant Werbel, Perry B Defendant Werbel, Roseann Defendant Paradise Gardens Sect III Maint Assn Inc Defendant Mortgage Electronic Reg Sys Inc Attorney Okon, Robert C, ESQ. |