Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Space Coast Credit Union Plaintiff vs. Sharon E Scott, et al Defendant
On February 16, 2012 a real prop non-homestead res fore =/>$250,000 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 16, 2012
Last Refreshed
October 06, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Real Prop Non-Homestead Res Fore =/>$250,000
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Order Denying Motion
Date: Jun 18, 2014Response to Motion
Date: Jun 17, 2014Motion
Date: Jun 16, 2014Order
Date: Jun 12, 2014Motion
Date: Jun 12, 2014Order Rescheduling Foreclosure Sale
Date: Apr 15, 2014Motion to Reset Sale Date
Date: Mar 27, 2014Notice of Filing
Date: Mar 27, 2014Order Rescheduling Foreclosure Sale
Date: Oct 04, 2013Order Cancelling Foreclosure Sale
Date: Aug 15, 2013Response to Request for Admissions
Date: May 22, 2013Motion for Extension of Time
Date: May 02, 2013Request for Admissions
Date: Apr 25, 2013Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title | |
June 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale | |
June 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet | |
June 18, 2014 | hearing | Foreclosure Sale | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion TO CANCEL 6/18/14 FORECLOSURE SALE |
|
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Foreclosure Sale Fee Payor: Moises Grayson ; Userid: CTS- ; Receipt: 20141RA1A016251; ;Amount: $70.00 |
|
June 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Response to Motion RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CANCEL JUNE 18, 2014 SALE AND RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURESALEParty: Plaintiff Space Coast Credit Union |
|
June 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion TO CANCEL JUNE 18, 2014, SALE AND RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALEParty: Defendant Scott, Sharon E |
|
June 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 6/12/14 at 9:27 AM in Room 519 Motion to Dismiss |
|
June 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 6/18/14 @ 8:45am rm 519 |
|
June 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order on motion to cancel sale. motion is denied w/o prejudice deft is instructed to contact her atty to et for rehearing . |
|
June 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion TO DISMISS |
|
June 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Re-open Fee Payor: SHARON SCOTT ; Userid: CTS-ldhanoolalpaul ; Receipt: 20141YE1L001080; ;Amount: $50.00 |
|
May 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication | |
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Re-open Fee Payor: BLAXBERG KUKOFF ; Userid: CTS-ahardy ; Receipt: 20141YE14000201; ;Amount: $50.00 |
|
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney 6/18/14 at 10am |
|
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Rescheduling Foreclosure Sale reset 06/18/14 |
|
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Sale to be Issued by Attorney | |
March 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
Reopen Case Billed -ALexis S. Read / Motion to reset foreclosure saleAmount: $50.00 |
|
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion to Reset Sale Date ATTACHED EXHIBITParty: Plaintiff Space Coast Credit Union |
|
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing BANKRUPTCY ORDER / ATTACHEDParty: Plaintiff Space Coast Credit Union |
|
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 04/15/14 @ 8:45 AM RM 519 |
|
February 04, 2014 | hearing | Foreclosure Sale | |
January 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Notice of Bankruptcy Case Filing / CASE # 14-12373-JKO |
|
October 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication SALE DATE 2/4/14 |
|
October 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney | |
October 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Sale to be Issued by Attorney | |
October 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order Rescheduling Foreclosure Sale AGREED ORDER |
|
August 27, 2013 | hearing |
Foreclosure Sale Per Order |
|
August 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Order Cancelling Foreclosure Sale | |
July 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Re-Notice of Hearing 8/15/13 @ 1:30PM RM 519 |
|
July 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation OF HEARING 7/16/13 |
|
June 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 07/16/13 @ 8:45 AM RM 519 |
|
May 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Admissions Party: Plaintiff Space Coast Credit Union |
|
May 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication | |
May 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Sale | |
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Plaintiff Space Coast Credit Union |
|
April 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Party: Defendant Scott, Sharon E |
|
April 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Rehearing PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSUREParty: Defendant Scott, Sharon E |
|
April 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Copies Mailed to all Parties; FJ/NSDB | |
April 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Sale | |
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Compliance with court orderParty: Plaintiff Space Coast Credit Union |
|
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing ORIG NOTE |
|
March 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service (pl's) of responses to df sharon scott 2nd set of interrogsParty: Plaintiff Space Coast Credit Union |
|
March 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses to pl 's complaintParty: Defendant Scott, Sharon E |
|
March 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Response (pl's) and objections to 2nd set of interrogs propounded by df sharon e scottParty: Plaintiff Space Coast Credit Union |
|
March 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Law in support of df's demand for evidentiary hearing to determine unliquidated damagesParty: Defendant Scott, Sharon E |
|
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production (2nd) by Deft ScottParty: Plaintiff Space Coast Credit Union |
|
March 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Admissions Party: Plaintiff Space Coast Credit Union |
|
March 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order on df's mot for referral to mediation or in the alternative a conciliation/ granted/ 03/22/13 |
|
March 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Mediation or in the alternative conciliation conferenceParty: Defendant Scott, Sharon E |
|
March 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing RM 518, 03/12/13 at 8:45am |
|
March 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing attached exhibit "A" to pl's complaintParty: Plaintiff Space Coast Credit Union |
|
March 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Plaintiff Space Coast Credit Union |
|
February 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Serving Second set of Interrogatories to PlParty: Defendant Scott, Sharon E |
|
February 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service Of Responses to Df's InterrogatoriesParty: Plaintiff Space Coast Credit Union |
|
February 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Re-Notice of Hearing 03-27-2013 @ 08:45Am Rm518 |
|
February 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Party: Defendant Scott, Sharon E |
|
February 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Party: Defendant Scott, Sharon E |
|
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Party: Defendant Scott, Sharon E |
|
February 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit attorney's fee |
|
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Final Judgment of Foreclosure Taxation of Cost and Award of Attys' FeesParty: Plaintiff Space Coast Credit Union |
|
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic jane doe, john doe and the unknown spouse of sharon e. scott |
|
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit as to Record of TitleParty: Plaintiff Space Coast Credit Union |
|
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Party: Defendant Space Coast Credit Union |
|
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Default against Dfs Space Coast Credit Union fka |
|
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Costs and Attys' Fees |
|
October 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Denying df Sharon E. Scott's Motion to Dismiss - Denied. df shall have 30 days from the date of this order o file an ans |
|
September 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Response to df, Sharon E Scott's Motion to dismissParty: Plaintiff Space Coast Credit Union |
|
August 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Party: Plaintiff Space Coast Credit Union |
|
August 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Indebtedness | |
August 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation of hrg 08-13-12 8:45 rm 518 |
|
August 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 10/3/12 at 8:45 am room 518 |
|
August 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Pl complaintParty: Defendant Scott, Sharon E |
|
August 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default (judicial/Sharon E. Scott) exhibit "A" attachedParty: Plaintiff Space Coast Credit Union |
|
August 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 8/13/12 8:45am rm 518 |
|
July 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 08/13/2012 at 8:45am room 518 and attached motion for additional time to respond |
|
May 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production plaintiffs response to defendants sharon e scotts first request for productionParty: Plaintiff Space Coast Credit Union |
|
May 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Plaintiff Space Coast Credit Union |
|
March 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Malcolm E. Harrison, Esq. FBN: 12839Party: Defendant Scott, Sharon E |
|
March 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request for Production of Documents defendants first request for production of documentsParty: Defendant Scott, Sharon E |
|
March 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of df's first interrogatories to plParty: Defendant Scott, Sharon E |
|
March 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Demand for writen verification of reinstatement and payoff figures for consumer debt pursuant to the fair dbt collection practices act.Party: Defendant Scott, Sharon E |
|
March 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served (20 days) 2/21/12Party: Defendant Scott, Sharon E |
|
March 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion for additional time to respondParty: Defendant Scott, Sharon E |
|
March 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved Jane Doe |
|
March 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved Unknown Spouse of Sharon E. Scott |
|
March 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved John Doe |
|
March 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 02/24/2012Party: Defendant Space Coast Credit Union |
|
March 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 02/18/2012Party: Defendant Franklin Farms Homeowners Assoc Inc |
|
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Refund Payor: COLLERAN, ISABEL ; Userid: CTS-nlopes ; Receipt: 20121YE1C001036; omments: CHECK # 7087 ;Amount: $6.00 |
|
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Plantiff's Counsel Regarding Plantiff's Representaive at MediationParty: Plaintiff Space Coast Credit Union |
|
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid Payor: COLLERAN, ISABEL ; Userid: CTS-nlopes ; Receipt: 20121YE1C001036; omments: CHECK # 7087 ;Amount: $1,906.00 |
|
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Defendant Count > than 5 Payor: COLLERAN, ISABEL ; Userid: CTS-nlopes ; Receipt: 20121YE1C001036; omments: CHECK # 7087 ;Amount: $2.50 |
|
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: COLLERAN, ISABEL ; Userid: CTS-nlopes ; Receipt: 20121YE1C001036; omments: CHECK # 7087 ;Amount: $60.00 |
|
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Unknown Spouse of Sharon E Scott; John Doe; Jane DoeParty: Defendant Scott, Sharon E Defendant Space Coast Credit Union Defendant Franklin Farms Homeowners Assoc Inc |
|
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Petition | |
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Value Claim Form | |
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event | FORM A | |
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Lis Pendens Fld & Rec |