Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
N GARVEY VS FLORIDA PENINSULA
On August 31, 2020 an insurance claim case was filed in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL. Judge CURT JACOBUS presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 31, 2020
Last Refreshed
July 04, 2023
Filing Location
Brevard County, FL
Category
INSURANCE CLAIM
Practice Area
Insurance
Matter Type
Insurance Coverage
Status
Dismissal
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I- BREACH OF CONTRACT
Parties
Case Documents
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Event Code 2922-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 32900982
Date: Dec 29, 2020MOTION TO COMPEL Event Code 2938-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 32795505
Date: Dec 02, 2020AMENDED COMPLAINT Event Code 2812-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 32629897
Date: Oct 27, 2020Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event | CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1 | |
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event | CR: HEARING CANCELLED Event Code 4291-Event Seq 2 | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE Event Code 10256-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 34245121 | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING Event Code 6741-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 34240661 | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 2 | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Event Code 12030-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 34223483 | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION RETURNED SERVED Event Code 7668-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 34210136 | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER Event Code 3017-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 34208213 | |
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING Event Code 6720-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 34190278 | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION IN OPPOSITION Event Code 2771-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 34155528 | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM Event Code 4607-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 33521517 | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Event Code 4949-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33276998 | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1 | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | CR: HEARING CANCELLED Event Code 4291-Event Seq 2 | |
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Event Code 2902-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 32983759 | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 4920-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 32975112 | |
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event | RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1 | |
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Event Code 2922-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 32900982 | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL Event Code 2938-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 32795505 | |
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT Event Code 2812-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 32629897 | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | ASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS Event Code 9566-Event Seq 9 | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL FILING UPDATED Event Code 2800-Event Seq 10 | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | ASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE Event Code 2138-Event Seq 8 | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL Event Code 2858-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 32378147 |