Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ERIN GREEN VS BREVARD COUNTY
On December 27, 2016 a discrimination employmnt/other case was filed in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL. Judge TONYA B. RAINWATER presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 27, 2016
Last Refreshed
November 13, 2023
Filing Location
Brevard County, FL
Category
DISCRIMINATION EMPLOYMNT/OTHER
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Matter Type
Discrimination
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
DSB: REFUND Event Code 1123-Event Seq 1
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
November 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE Event Code 10256-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 28102025
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
October 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION Event Code 4612-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27917917
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
September 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE FOR JURY TRIAL Event Code 6819-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27828359
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM Event Code 4607-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 27743845
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM Event Code 4607-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27743843
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Event Code 4603-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 27743847
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT SIGNED Event Code 7922-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27498453
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
June 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR CERTIFIED MAIL Event Code 9915-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27474098
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
June 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 1
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
June 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER REGARDING JURISDICTION TRANSFER RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 2352-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 27423157
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Event Code 4603-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27348355
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
May 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Event Code 4603-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27348010
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
May 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Event Code 4603-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 27348011
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM Event Code 4607-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27328830
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
May 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES Event Code 6737-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27300153
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
May 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE Event Code 6859-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 27300154
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
May 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO TRANSFER Event Code 2962-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27300082
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
INTERROGATORIES Event Code 4616-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 27167212
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 6729-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27167210
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Event Code 6739-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 27167211
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE Event Code 6859-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27164557
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 4948-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 27164558
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
March 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE Event Code 4921-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27122084
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
March 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE Event Code 4921-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 27122085
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE Event Code 6859-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 26955386
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Event Code 4606-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 26934942
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Event Code 4606-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 26934943
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
February 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES Event Code 6742-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 26920564
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
February 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE Event Code 6859-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 26920557
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY Event Code 6738-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 26799037
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 6729-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 26799039
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM Event Code 4607-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 26798301
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM Event Code 4607-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 26798302
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
ASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE Event Code 2138-Event Seq 1
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED COPY OF FILE FROM FLORIDA COUNTY Event Code 2758-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 26720565
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |
|
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
CASE TRANSFERRED ORIG PENDING Event Code 2789-Event Seq 3
Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER |