Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
US BANK NA AS VS C M SCHUMANN
On January 31, 2013 a fcl-non-homestead $250000 & > case was filed in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL. Judge LISA DAVIDSON presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 31, 2013
Last Refreshed
November 13, 2023
Filing Location
Brevard County, FL
Category
FCL-NON-HOMESTEAD $250000 & >
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Judgment of Foreclosure
Parties
Case Documents
JOINT STIPULATION Event Code 5322-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 26757175
Date: Jan 06, 2017Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE FROM THE CLERK OF COURT Event Code 10631-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 27111998
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF CLERK Event Code 9879-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27111808
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL Event Code 5972-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27042278
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL Event Code 5972-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27034582
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL Event Code 5972-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 27035106
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE Event Code 6735-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27022336
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENTS Event Code 5130-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 26991437
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Event Code 5131-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 26991431
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
CR: JUDICIAL SALE HELD Event Code 4644-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
CAL:FORECLOSURE SALE Event Code 3948-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
ASM: DOC STAMPS Event Code 10325-Event Seq 6
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE Event Code 5132-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 26893464
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
ASM: JUDICIAL SALE FORECLOSURE Event Code 51-Event Seq 4
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
FORECLOSURE BID SHEET Event Code 10020-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 26896190
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Event Code 5158-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 26884757
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION REGARDING NOTICE OF SALE Event Code 7715-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 26872894
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE Event Code 6740-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 26822627
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE $250,000 OR GREATER RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 1489-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 26778631
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
CIRCUIT CASE TYPE CHANGE ONLY Event Code 2494-Event Seq 6
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
CAL:CASE MGMNT CONFERENCE Event Code 6075-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Event Code 6722-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 26778621
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARD Event Code 4412-Event Seq 4
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 5
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIPULATION Event Code 5322-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 26757175
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENT Event Code 11517-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 26408347
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Event Code 10623-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 26402921
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
CR: CASE MGMNT CONF CONT BY CT Event Code 5737-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
CAL:CASE MGMNT CONFERENCE Event Code 6075-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
CONSENT Event Code 6878-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 26389843
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENT Event Code 11517-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 26040443
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER DIRECTING OR GRANTING MEDIATION Event Code 10015-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 26009240
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Event Code 9883-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 26009924
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARD Event Code 4412-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
CAL:CASE MGMNT CONFERENCE Event Code 6075-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENT Event Code 11517-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 25720351
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
CAL:CASE MGMNT CONFERENCE Event Code 6075-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER Event Code 4769-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 25708400
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
CR: CASE MGMNT CONF CONT BY CT Event Code 5737-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Event Code 9883-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 25575959
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Event Code 6720-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 25331441
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY COURT Event Code 3006-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 25331430
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
November 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER Event Code 4769-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 25115966
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
November 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
CAL:CASE MGMNT CONFERENCE Event Code 6075-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
November 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
CR: NO ACTION TAKEN Event Code 4449-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Event Code 2922-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 24997360
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY AFFIDAVIT REGARDING FEES, TIME, AND-OR COSTS Event Code 5201-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24996742
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY AFFIDAVIT REGARDING FEES, TIME, AND-OR COSTS Event Code 5201-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 24996744
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL Event Code 5972-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24949673
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Event Code 9883-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24876771
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY Event Code 6347-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24855436
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF CO-COUNSEL Event Code 6991-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24798949
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
CR: NON JURY TRIAL CANCELLED Event Code 4211-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
CAL:NON JURY TRIAL Event Code 3902-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO ABATE Event Code 2961-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 24377167
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT Event Code 6938-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24374241
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESS/EXHIBIT LIST Event Code 9713-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24368340
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 4920-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24337386
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM Event Code 4607-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 24315955
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM Event Code 4607-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24315953
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM Event Code 4607-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 24312737
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM Event Code 4607-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24312689
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER DENYING PETITION OR MOTION Event Code 6282-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 24307889
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARING HEARD Event Code 4407-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24294296
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 24294773
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER Event Code 3017-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24284976
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST Event Code 6930-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24279776
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT Event Code 6938-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24262934
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM Event Code 4607-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 24259824
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST Event Code 6930-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24256121
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST Event Code 6930-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 24206249
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 6729-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24206248
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL Event Code 5972-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23805276
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Event Code 5176-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23798927
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF NON JURY TRIAL Event Code 6272-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23784646
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL Event Code 6475-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 23775058
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
CR: NON JURY TRIAL CONT BY CT Event Code 4210-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
CAL:NON JURY TRIAL Event Code 3902-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE Event Code 6787-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 23757962
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO STRIKE Event Code 2959-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23756998
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST Event Code 6930-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23736298
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT Event Code 6938-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23724130
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
AMENDED RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 4956-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23699236
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
CR: NON JURY TRIAL CANCELLED Event Code 4211-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
CAL:NON JURY TRIAL Event Code 3902-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE Event Code 6368-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23336753
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
AMENDED ORDER Event Code 6335-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23309237
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE Event Code 2914-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 23305000
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Event Code 5349-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23302254
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES Event Code 6737-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23297560
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES Event Code 6737-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 23297561
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Event Code 5176-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23292688
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST Event Code 6930-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23282787
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
AMENDED RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 4956-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23272239
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Event Code 4927-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 23272240
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION Event Code 9740-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 23272245
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Event Code 4927-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 23272244
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
AMENDED RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 4956-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 23272242
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 4920-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23258616
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY Event Code 6347-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23231018
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Event Code 5349-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23213971
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 4920-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 23169518
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Event Code 4927-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 23169517
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Event Code 4927-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23169513
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Event Code 4927-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23121042
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE Event Code 6859-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 23117906
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE Event Code 6859-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23115727
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE Event Code 6859-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 23117913
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE Event Code 6859-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 23117914
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Event Code 6739-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22931533
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF NON JURY TRIAL Event Code 6272-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22880232
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING MOTION OR PETITION Event Code 6267-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 22863099
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO AMEND ANSWER Event Code 2990-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 22854921
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CASE SET FOR TRIAL Event Code 4652-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 22844054
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
CAL:CASE MGMNT CONFERENCE Event Code 6075-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARD Event Code 4412-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER SUBSTITUTING PARTY(IES) Event Code 6366-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 22816511
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Event Code 9883-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22807549
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22755478
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Event Code 5176-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 22758200
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY(IES) Event Code 2755-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22700861
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Event Code 5176-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22631285
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Event Code 6700-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22562640
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Event Code 5176-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22451894
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARD Event Code 4412-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER Event Code 4769-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 22446491
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
CAL:CASE MGMNT CONFERENCE Event Code 6075-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Event Code 5176-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22409691
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Event Code 9883-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22378148
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
CAL:NON JURY TRIAL Event Code 3902-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
CR: NON JURY TRIAL CANCELLED Event Code 4211-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST Event Code 6930-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22191860
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Event Code 5176-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22112440
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
November 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT Event Code 6938-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22041316
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
AMENDED MOTION Event Code 3057-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21913075
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Event Code 6720-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21858659
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF NON JURY TRIAL Event Code 6272-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 21867002
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Event Code 6720-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21841086
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Event Code 9881-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 21845041
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARING HEARD Event Code 4407-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21710072
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT Event Code 6938-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21652380
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE Event Code 11567-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 21652381
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NON-JURY TRIAL Event Code 6818-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21640373
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE Event Code 11567-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 21431978
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE Event Code 11567-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21431772
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
ELECTRONICALLY FILED (E-FILED) NOTE AND MORTGAGE Event Code 10089-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21345337
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE REGARDING DEFENDANTS STATUS Event Code 4479-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 21330463
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Event Code 2922-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21330335
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS OR AMOUNT DUE Event Code 5183-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 21330347
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY AFFIDAVIT REGARDING FEES, TIME, AND-OR COSTS Event Code 5201-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 21330340
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY AFFIDAVIT REGARDING FEES, TIME, AND-OR COSTS Event Code 5201-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 21330377
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE AND/OR MORTGAGE Event Code 6770-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21262815
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Event Code 5176-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20644811
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Event Code 4962-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20593722
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Event Code 4949-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20531639
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Event Code 4949-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Event Code 4949-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 20509317
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 20507138
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20507095
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20507030
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 20507169
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE Event Code 4921-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20489130
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL FILING UPDATED Event Code 2800-Event Seq 13
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
CIRCUIT CASE TYPE CHANGE ONLY Event Code 2494-Event Seq 12
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 10
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
MORTGAGE CLAIM AMOUNT WORKSHEET Event Code 1417-Event Seq 7-Barcode ID 20402405
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 8
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 9
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 11
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT OR PETITION Event Code 2835-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 20402399
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 2561-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 20402401
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
ASM: LIS PENDENS - FIRST PAGE Event Code 2585-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
COVER SHEET Event Code 6507-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 20402396
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
ASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS Event Code 9566-Event Seq 3
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
ASM: FORECLOSURE $250,000 & > Event Code 1331-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |