Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CORNELL SANDERS
On June 26, 2012 a guardianship case was filed in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL. Judge LISA DAVIDSON presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 26, 2012
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
Brevard County, FL
Category
GUARDIANSHIP
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
Guardianship,Conservatorship
Status
Active
Parties
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
TO BE REASSIGNED TO JUDGE RAINWATER AS OF 01-01-2019 Event Code 11702-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
ADMIN USE AACTS Event Code 10719-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
ADMIN USE APS Event Code 10718-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
COPY Event Code 6806-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21070333
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
GA REOPEN DISP-LOCALLY PENDING Event Code 5786-Event Seq 3
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 4
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SELL REAL PROPERTY RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6280-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20785281
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
COURT MINUTES Event Code 8254-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20785276
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 20975073
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
PETITION TO SELL REAL ESTATE RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 2816-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20753481
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Event Code 6720-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 20975028
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Event Code 6720-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 20974983
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
REOPEN FILING UPDATED Event Code 2802-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
November 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARING HEARD Event Code 4407-Event Seq 6
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
November 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
AMENDED PETITION Event Code 2762-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20108224
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
November 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
EVIDENCE/EXHIBIT LOG Event Code 6121-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 20108227
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
November 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
COURT MINUTES Event Code 8254-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 20108226
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
November 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
CONSENT Event Code 6878-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 20108225
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
November 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
PETITION Event Code 8031-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20023827
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 20024622
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
REOPEN FILING UPDATED Event Code 2802-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER AUTHORIZING PAYMENT OF ATTORNEY FEES RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6242-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20008267
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
GA REOPEN DISP-LOCALLY PENDING Event Code 5786-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
REOPEN FILING UPDATED Event Code 2802-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
PETITION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING ATTORNEY FEES Event Code 4633-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19947134
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
LETTERS OF GUARDIANSHIP RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6293-Event Seq 7-Barcode ID 19911143
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6251-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 19911132
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
EVIDENCE/EXHIBIT LOG Event Code 6121-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 19910970
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARING HEARD Event Code 4407-Event Seq 3
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
WITNESS TESTIMONY LOG Event Code 7422-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 19910973
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
COURT MINUTES Event Code 8254-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 19910959
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
EVIDENCE/EXHIBIT LOG Event Code 6121-Event Seq 9-Barcode ID 19926835
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
GA ORIG DISPOSED LOCAL PENDING Event Code 5793-Event Seq 8
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PRODUCE AT HEARING OR TRIAL Event Code 9769-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19899442
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19875880
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
PETITION OR MOTION FOR ORDER Event Code 3035-Event Seq 9-Barcode ID 19869735
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6866-Event Seq 11-Barcode ID 19869771
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION Event Code 4945-Event Seq 10-Barcode ID 19869762
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 6729-Event Seq 12-Barcode ID 19869787
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT OR PETITION Event Code 2835-Event Seq 8-Barcode ID 19869730
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION Event Code 4945-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19911114
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES Event Code 5739-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19832243
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER EXTENDING APPOINTMENT OF EMERGENCY TEMPORARY GUARDIAN Event Code 6264-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 19846173
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19807778
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES Event Code 5739-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 19807416
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PETITION TO DETERMINE INCAPACITY Event Code 4990-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19807413
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
PETITION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING ATTORNEY FEES Event Code 4633-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19801067
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING Event Code 6741-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19728517
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
COPY Event Code 6806-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19708529
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE Event Code 7843-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19603416
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF FORMAL NOTICE Event Code 5153-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19570920
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN Event Code 2829-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 19570575
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
FORMAL NOTICE Event Code 6775-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19570573
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
FORMAL NOTICE Event Code 6775-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 19511985
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN Event Code 2829-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 19512844
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
FORMAL NOTICE Event Code 6775-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 19512810
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
OATH OF GUARDIAN, DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 5140-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 19512853
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT AS GUARDIAN Event Code 6782-Event Seq 7-Barcode ID 19512855
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PETITION TO DETERMINE INCAPACITY Event Code 4990-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19511979
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19460656
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARING HEARD Event Code 4407-Event Seq 5
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
LETTERS OF TEMPORARY EMERGENCY GUARDIANSHIP RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6463-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 19478532
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
COURT MINUTES Event Code 8254-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 19480099
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
LETTERS OF TEMPORARY EMERGENCY GUARDIANSHIP RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6463-Event Seq 7-Barcode ID 19480108
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
WITNESS TESTIMONY LOG Event Code 7422-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 19480101
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPOINTING EMERGENCY TEMPORARY GUARDIAN RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6241-Event Seq 8-Barcode ID 19480111
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT AS GUARDIAN Event Code 6782-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 19440795
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF EMERGENCY TEMPORARY GUARDIAN Event Code 2827-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 19440793
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION Event Code 4132-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 19440802
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN Event Code 2829-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 19440787
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
OATH OF GUARDIAN, DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 5140-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 19440800
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: FORMAL ADMIN $25K - $60K Event Code 2362-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL FILING UPDATED Event Code 2800-Event Seq 7
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |