Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DINA ZAKI VS ROMANE KING
On December 04, 2012 a domestic violence w/children case was filed by Zaki Dina, against King Romane Michael, in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL. Judge GEORGE B. TURNER presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 04, 2012
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
Brevard County, FL
Category
DOMESTIC VIOLENCE W/CHILDREN
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Domestic Violence
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
COURT MINUTES REGARDING INJUNCTION HEARING Event Code 8266-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 20237362
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
INJUNCTION ORDER OF DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6078-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 20237510
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 5
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
CAL:INJUNCTION HEARING Event Code 3947-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARD Event Code 4412-Event Seq 2
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
TEMPORARY INJUNCTION RETURNED SERVED Event Code 7771-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20201028
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
December 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF INJUNCTION Event Code 9795-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20186116
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
December 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO MODIFY INJUNCTION Event Code 9742-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20171424
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
December 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
TEMPORARY INJUNCTION ISSUED Event Code 7777-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF RELATED CASES Event Code 7359-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 20158412
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL FILING UPDATED Event Code 2800-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
PETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION Event Code 2735-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 20158405
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
COVER SHEET Event Code 6507-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 20158403
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
FAXED TEMPORARY INJUNCTION Event Code 6358-Event Seq 8-Barcode ID 20165930
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
FEE EXEMPT: NO FEE AUTHORIZED Event Code 5554-Event Seq 2
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
TEMPORARY INJUNCTION AND NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6225-Event Seq 9-Barcode ID 20172605
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
INJUNCTION AFFIDAVIT REGARDING JUVENILE DEPENDENCY Event Code 6194-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 20158409
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF CLERK REGARDING SEARCH OF RECORD Event Code 5128-Event Seq 7-Barcode ID 20158414
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |