Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DOR VS LUIS GONZALEZ
On October 12, 2012 a support-dor case case was filed in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL. Judge JAMES H EARP presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 12, 2012
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
Brevard County, FL
Category
SUPPORT-DOR CASE
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Child Support
Status
Closed
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS Event Code 6744-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21594033
Judge: JAMES H EARP |
|
March 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL Event Code 5972-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20616594
Judge: JAMES H EARP |
|
March 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR SUPPORT Event Code 1935-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20613665
Judge: JAMES H EARP |
|
March 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 2
Judge: JAMES H EARP |
|
March 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
DOMESTIC RELATIONS FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT Event Code 932-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 20577178
Judge: JAMES H EARP |
|
March 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARING HEARD Event Code 4407-Event Seq 5
Judge: JAMES H EARP |
|
March 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET Event Code 4974-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 20577175
Judge: JAMES H EARP |
|
March 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1
Judge: JAMES H EARP |
|
March 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
HEARING OFFICER OR GENERAL MAGISTRATES NOTES Event Code 3627-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20577173
Judge: JAMES H EARP |
|
January 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED Event Code 6143-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20377696
Judge: JAMES H EARP |
|
January 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK Event Code 2920-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20325545
Judge: JAMES H EARP |
|
January 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING BEFORE THE SUPPORT HEARING OFFICER Event Code 9952-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20339683
Judge: JAMES H EARP |
|
December 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS Event Code 6744-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20165728
Judge: JAMES H EARP |
|
November 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
DOMESTIC RELATIONS FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT Event Code 932-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20074037
Judge: JAMES H EARP |
|
November 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20049732
Judge: JAMES H EARP |
|
October 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 1
Judge: JAMES H EARP |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER Event Code 6834-Event Seq 9-Barcode ID 19942856
Judge: JAMES H EARP |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET Event Code 4974-Event Seq 7-Barcode ID 19942854
Judge: JAMES H EARP |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
DOMESTIC RELATIONS FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT Event Code 932-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 19942853
Judge: JAMES H EARP |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
COVER SHEET Event Code 6507-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 19942850
Judge: JAMES H EARP |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
PETITION Event Code 8031-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 19942852
Judge: JAMES H EARP |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
FEE EXEMPT: IV-D Event Code 5555-Event Seq 10
Judge: JAMES H EARP |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL FILING UPDATED Event Code 2800-Event Seq 3
Judge: JAMES H EARP |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET Event Code 4974-Event Seq 8-Barcode ID 19942855
Judge: JAMES H EARP |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
WAV:IV-D REIMBURSEMENT PROGRAM Event Code 5552-Event Seq 2
Judge: JAMES H EARP |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: IV-D REIMBURSMENT PROGRAM Event Code 5565-Event Seq 1
Judge: JAMES H EARP |