Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ROBERT WYATT HUNTER
On December 26, 2012 a probate case was filed by (Subcribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL. Judge JOHN M HARRIS presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 26, 2012
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
Brevard County, FL
Judge
Category
PROBATE
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
General Probate
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
RECALL CONFIRM COLLECTION AGY Event Code 9122-Event Seq 2
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
RECALL REQUEST SUBMIT MSB Event Code 9124-Event Seq 1
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6275-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23272711
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 2
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF FORMAL NOTICE Event Code 5153-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22674065
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
March 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 2871-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22624289
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
August 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
COPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE Event Code 5150-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21621030
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
August 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE Event Code 4481-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 21621349
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
August 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
AMENDED PETITION Event Code 2762-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 21621038
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
May 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
PROBATE STATEMENT OF CLAIM Event Code 2722-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21236845
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
April 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
PLACED MSB COLLECTIONS Event Code 9106-Event Seq 1
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
PROBATE STATEMENT OF CLAIM Event Code 2722-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20648637
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
March 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
PROBATE STATEMENT OF CLAIM Event Code 2722-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20643592
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
PROBATE STATEMENT OF CLAIM Event Code 2722-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20390178
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
PROBATE STATEMENT OF CLAIM Event Code 2722-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 20390204
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
PROBATE STATEMENT OF CLAIM Event Code 2722-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 20390206
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
PROBATE STATEMENT OF CLAIM Event Code 2722-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20390174
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
January 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
PROBATE STATEMENT OF CLAIM Event Code 2722-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20383102
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
January 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF CLERK Event Code 9879-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20270857
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE Event Code 6735-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20250758
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 2871-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20250693
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL FILING UPDATED Event Code 2800-Event Seq 5
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO CREDITORS Event Code 6772-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 20250747
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED COPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 5137-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20250741
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: SUMMARY ADMIN $1000+ Event Code 2372-Event Seq 4
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |