Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ARNETT KEESEE VS LAVADA WELCH
On December 07, 2012 an other real property 0-$50000 case was filed by Keesee Arnett W, represented by Eley Edmond L, against Welch Lavada Loyce, in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL. Judge GEORGE B. TURNER presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 07, 2012
Last Refreshed
February 22, 2021
Filing Location
Brevard County, FL
Category
OTHER REAL PROPERTY 0-$50000
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
General Property
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
LACK OF PROSECUTION ELIGIBLE Event Code 5560-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
January 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
TO BE REASSIGNED TO JUDGE TURNER AS OF 01-01-2019 Event Code 11695-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
October 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
LACK OF PROSECUTION ELIGIBLE Event Code 5560-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
September 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
February 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
CR: NO ACTION TAKEN Event Code 4449-Event Seq 2
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
February 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
January 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20396383
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Event Code 2931-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20391507
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED Event Code 6143-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20343956
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
January 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AND/OR SERVICE Event Code 5102-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20325007
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
January 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE Event Code 4921-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20324987
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
January 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK Event Code 2920-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20312193
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20241669
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
December 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT OR PETITION Event Code 2835-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 20188209
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
December 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL FILING UPDATED Event Code 2800-Event Seq 5
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
December 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
COVER SHEET Event Code 6507-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 20188207
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
December 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS Event Code 9566-Event Seq 2
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |
|
December 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM:FORECLOSURE 50,000 OR LESS Event Code 1308-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER |