Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
WELLS FARGO VS KANDARA KEO
On December 26, 2012 a fcl-homestead $50001-$249999 case was filed in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL. Judge LISA DAVIDSON presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 26, 2012
Last Refreshed
February 22, 2021
Filing Location
Brevard County, FL
Category
FCL-HOMESTEAD $50001-$249999
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Dismissal
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Event Code 6700-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24288407
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT Event Code 1644-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 23786931
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 5
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Event Code 6722-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 23786935
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 10257-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 23786930
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
ASM: RECORDING TWO PAGES Event Code 10259-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Event Code 3004-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23532321
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED Event Code 6143-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 23532344
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
CR: NON JURY TRIAL CANCELLED Event Code 4211-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
CAL:NON JURY TRIAL Event Code 3902-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
ASM: RECORDING TWO PAGES Event Code 10259-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6734-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 23526666
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK Event Code 2920-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 23526668
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE Event Code 6368-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23481561
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIPULATION Event Code 5322-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23446664
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY Event Code 6817-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23274371
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION Event Code 6849-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 23154761
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST Event Code 6930-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23152552
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Event Code 5176-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 23152570
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF NON JURY TRIAL Event Code 6272-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23158850
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER DIRECTING OR GRANTING MEDIATION Event Code 10015-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 23140537
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARD Event Code 4412-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CASE SET FOR TRIAL Event Code 4652-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 23128692
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
CAL:CASE MGMNT CONFERENCE Event Code 6075-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO SET MEDIATION Event Code 3079-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23123747
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY Event Code 6347-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23023421
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Event Code 5176-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22918772
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL Event Code 2958-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22923627
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO WITHDRAW COUNSEL Event Code 2965-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22875603
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Event Code 9883-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22856711
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES Event Code 4954-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 22713952
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Event Code 5176-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22713938
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF CO-COUNSEL Event Code 6991-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22668216
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT Event Code 6938-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22212804
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Event Code 5158-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 22212807
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 4920-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 21607904
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PRODUCE Event Code 6927-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 21608634
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Event Code 4962-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21607694
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT Event Code 6938-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21549281
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE Event Code 5170-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20781445
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION Event Code 6849-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20607257
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER DIRECTING OR GRANTING MEDIATION Event Code 10015-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 20535344
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARING HEARD Event Code 4407-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO EXTEND TIME Event Code 2945-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20472395
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO SET MEDIATION Event Code 3079-Event Seq 3
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO SET MEDIATION Event Code 3079-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20364504
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6866-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20360195
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20370839
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO SET MEDIATION Event Code 3079-Event Seq 12
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO SET MEDIATION Event Code 3079-Event Seq 11-Barcode ID 20348213
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES Event Code 5739-Event Seq 9-Barcode ID 20340877
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 6729-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 20340869
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Event Code 6700-Event Seq 8
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Event Code 6700-Event Seq 7-Barcode ID 20340873
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES Event Code 5739-Event Seq 10
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 6729-Event Seq 6
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Event Code 6739-Event Seq 4
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Event Code 4949-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Event Code 4949-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20337737
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Event Code 6739-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 20340856
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 20338080
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 20337134
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 20338108
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20334688
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20337130
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 3
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 4
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 5
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 2561-Event Seq 9-Barcode ID 20254962
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
MORTGAGE CLAIM AMOUNT WORKSHEET Event Code 1417-Event Seq 10-Barcode ID 20254964
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT OR PETITION Event Code 2835-Event Seq 8-Barcode ID 20254957
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL FILING UPDATED Event Code 2800-Event Seq 6
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: LIS PENDENS - ADDTL PAGE Event Code 2587-Event Seq 3
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
COVER SHEET Event Code 6507-Event Seq 7-Barcode ID 20254928
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: FORECLOSURE $250,000 & > Event Code 1331-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: INDEX RECORDING NAMES > 4 Event Code 1662-Event Seq 4
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS Event Code 9566-Event Seq 5
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: LIS PENDENS - FIRST PAGE Event Code 2585-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |