Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
NATIONWIDE VS DENISE CLAUSEN
On December 26, 2012 a fcl-homestead $50001-$249999 case was filed in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL. Judge LISA DAVIDSON presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 26, 2012
Last Refreshed
November 13, 2023
Filing Location
Brevard County, FL
Category
FCL-HOMESTEAD $50001-$249999
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Active
Parties
Case Documents
NOTICE TO WITHDRAW MOTION Event Code 6827-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 28053344
Date: Nov 03, 2017MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT Event Code 9788-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27485757
Date: Jun 21, 2017ORDER Event Code 6322-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 27467685
Date: Jun 16, 2017ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS Event Code 6485-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 27467428
Date: Jun 16, 2017ORDER EXTENDING TIME Event Code 6261-Event Seq 8-Barcode ID 27470333
Date: Jun 16, 2017MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE Event Code 2914-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 27318891
Date: May 16, 2017MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER Event Code 3017-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 27297821
Date: May 10, 2017MOTION FOR EXTENSION Event Code 9740-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 27193652
Date: Apr 18, 2017REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Event Code 4930-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 27108865
Date: Mar 27, 2017REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 6729-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 27108864
Date: Mar 27, 2017Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
DSB: REFUND BOND Event Code 1124-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION Event Code 4129-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 31013342
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO WITHDRAW MOTION Event Code 6827-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 28053344
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
ALL REOPEN COMPL EVENTS CLOSED Event Code 3579-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE Event Code 6859-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27921951
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING MOTION OR PETITION Event Code 6267-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27892408
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
REOPEN DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2803-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY Event Code 6817-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27649808
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27538061
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 27538071
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
CAL:EVIDENTIARY HEARING Event Code 3920-Event Seq 3
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARING CANCELLED Event Code 4291-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
CR: EVIDENTRY HRG CANCELLED Event Code 4283-Event Seq 4
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT Event Code 9788-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27485757
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
REOPEN FILING UPDATED Event Code 2802-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING Event Code 6741-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27469660
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER Event Code 6322-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 27467685
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS Event Code 6485-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 27467428
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER EXTENDING TIME Event Code 6261-Event Seq 8-Barcode ID 27470333
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARING HEARD Event Code 4407-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
REOPEN DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2803-Event Seq 9
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
REOPEN DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2803-Event Seq 7
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
REOPEN DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2803-Event Seq 10
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
REOPEN FILING UPDATED Event Code 2802-Event Seq 4
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
REOPEN DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2803-Event Seq 5
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 4920-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27322512
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES Event Code 6736-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 27318892
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE Event Code 2914-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 27318891
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 27318893
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
REOPEN FILING UPDATED Event Code 2802-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
CROSS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM Event Code 4621-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27312598
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27299186
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER Event Code 3017-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 27297821
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
REOPEN FILING UPDATED Event Code 2802-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6866-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27224264
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES Event Code 6737-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 27219452
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES Event Code 6737-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27217101
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION Event Code 9740-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 27193652
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Event Code 4927-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27191003
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE Event Code 6735-Event Seq 7-Barcode ID 27193992
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE Event Code 6859-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 27191057
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
REOPEN FILING UPDATED Event Code 2802-Event Seq 4
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE Event Code 6859-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 27191012
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
ASM: REOPEN CIRCUIT MOTION FEE Event Code 61-Event Seq 5
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS Event Code 5482-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 27188440
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Event Code 4603-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27188439
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY Event Code 6817-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27151208
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27147727
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES Event Code 6737-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 27149066
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Event Code 4930-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 27108865
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES Event Code 6737-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27104511
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Event Code 6739-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 27108866
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 6729-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 27108864
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE Event Code 6859-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 26827903
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY OF RECORD Event Code 6640-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 26542559
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORIG NOTE/MTG RETD PER ORDER Event Code 4991-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER DIRECTING CLERK Event Code 6317-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 25969197
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL MTG DOCS TO BE RETD Event Code 10109-Event Seq 3
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
REOPEN DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2803-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
REOPEN FILING UPDATED Event Code 2802-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO RETURN ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE Event Code 4238-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 25935255
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 6729-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 24742876
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Event Code 6739-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 24742875
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Event Code 6739-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24742874
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING MOTION OR PETITION Event Code 6267-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24732811
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASE REOPENED Event Code 4702-Event Seq 3
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
REOPEN FILING UPDATED Event Code 2802-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 6
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
DEPOSITION Event Code 4609-Event Seq 7-Barcode ID 24420660
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
CR: NON JURY TRIAL CONT BY CT Event Code 4210-Event Seq 8
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 5649-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 24419644
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR ASSESSMENT FOR ATTORNEY FEES/COSTS Event Code 2910-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 24414864
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION Event Code 6766-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 24410678
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
CAL:NON JURY TRIAL Event Code 3902-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
TRANSCRIPT OF DEPOSITION Event Code 7487-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 24410679
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT Event Code 6938-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24399533
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY AFFIDAVIT REGARDING FEES, TIME, AND-OR COSTS Event Code 5201-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 24399535
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF OBJECTION Event Code 6920-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 24379042
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT Event Code 6938-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24375492
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY AFFIDAVIT REGARDING FEES, TIME, AND-OR COSTS Event Code 5201-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 24375493
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE Event Code 4921-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24360068
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL Event Code 5972-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL Event Code 5972-Event Seq 3
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL Event Code 5972-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24349351
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
AMENDED WITNESS LIST Event Code 9855-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24319061
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE Event Code 6859-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 24305614
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
CR: NON JURY TRIAL CONT BY CT Event Code 4210-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
CAL:NON JURY TRIAL Event Code 3902-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT LIST Event Code 6110-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 24302169
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE Event Code 6859-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 24302171
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6866-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24299596
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
WITNESS LIST Event Code 6841-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 24302172
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE Event Code 6859-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 24302170
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF NON JURY TRIAL Event Code 6272-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24300688
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING MOTION OR PETITION Event Code 6267-Event Seq 9-Barcode ID 24293534
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL Event Code 6475-Event Seq 7-Barcode ID 24293498
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARING HEARD Event Code 4407-Event Seq 8
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT(S) Event Code 6118-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 24288623
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT Event Code 6938-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 24287150
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT Event Code 6938-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 24288621
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY AFFIDAVIT REGARDING FEES, TIME, AND-OR COSTS Event Code 5201-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 24287151
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Event Code 5158-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 24288622
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24258577
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER EXTENDING TIME Event Code 6261-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 24231892
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24230853
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
TRANSCRIPT OF DEPOSITION Event Code 7487-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 24211899
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
CR: NON JURY TRIAL CANCELLED Event Code 4211-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION Event Code 6766-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 24211898
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
CAL:NON JURY TRIAL Event Code 3902-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Event Code 2922-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 24211900
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Event Code 6739-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24201051
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF OBJECTION Event Code 6920-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24163300
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 4920-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24149126
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO EXTEND TIME Event Code 2945-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 24142830
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
AMENDED WITNESS LIST Event Code 9855-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24142171
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT Event Code 6938-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24134667
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE Event Code 6859-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 24126024
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE Event Code 6859-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 24126028
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
WITNESS LIST Event Code 6841-Event Seq 7-Barcode ID 24126030
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT Event Code 6938-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24126016
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Event Code 5158-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 24126019
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS Event Code 5125-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 24126018
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT LIST Event Code 6110-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 24126023
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF NON JURY TRIAL Event Code 6272-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24114655
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Event Code 4606-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24100785
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARING HEARD Event Code 4407-Event Seq 3
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER Event Code 6322-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 24096394
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24089573
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER Event Code 3017-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24085516
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Event Code 6838-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 24066348
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM Event Code 4607-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24066347
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO AMEND ANSWER Event Code 2990-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24015248
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Event Code 2902-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 24004076
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Event Code 6739-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 24004073
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 6729-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24004072
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT Event Code 7030-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 24004074
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Event Code 9881-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 24011348
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARING HEARD Event Code 4407-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
CAL:MOTION HEARING Event Code 3965-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
AMENDED WITNESS LIST Event Code 9855-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23952834
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE Event Code 10372-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23839393
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COUNT RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 4306-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 23841416
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
ASM: INDEX RECORDING NAMES > 4 Event Code 1662-Event Seq 3
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING COPY OF NOTE AND/OR MORTGAGE Event Code 10095-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23825112
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
ASM: RECORDING TWO PAGES Event Code 10259-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE Event Code 4921-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23798427
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23765873
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE Event Code 6859-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 23758045
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT LIST Event Code 6110-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23758042
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
WITNESS LIST Event Code 6841-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 23758047
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE Event Code 6859-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 23758044
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF NON JURY TRIAL Event Code 6272-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23756008
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CASE SET FOR TRIAL Event Code 4652-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23758784
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARD Event Code 4412-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
CAL:CASE MGMNT CONFERENCE Event Code 6075-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE Event Code 6859-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23556209
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Event Code 9883-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23552070
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Event Code 6739-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23409165
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE Event Code 6859-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23386792
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Event Code 9883-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23383762
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Event Code 9883-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 23379833
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
CR: CASE MGMNT CONF CONT BY CT Event Code 5737-Event Seq 3
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
CAL:CASE MGMNT CONFERENCE Event Code 6075-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER EXTENDING TIME Event Code 6261-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23315532
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE Event Code 6859-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23247662
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Event Code 9883-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23161846
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 4920-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 23146957
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION Event Code 9740-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 23145570
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Event Code 4927-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23141699
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Event Code 4930-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 23010853
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 6729-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 23010851
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Event Code 6739-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23010850
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Event Code 2922-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22942552
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER EXTENDING TIME Event Code 6261-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22886654
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION Event Code 9740-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22856157
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6734-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22754475
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Event Code 4930-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 22709241
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 6729-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 22709239
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Event Code 6739-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22709238
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING COPY OF NOTE AND/OR MORTGAGE Event Code 10095-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22694395
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY OF RECORD Event Code 6640-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22565373
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Event Code 3004-Event Seq 3
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Event Code 3004-Event Seq 6
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Event Code 3004-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22324129
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Event Code 3004-Event Seq 8
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Event Code 3004-Event Seq 7
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Event Code 3004-Event Seq 5
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Event Code 3004-Event Seq 4
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Event Code 3004-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK Event Code 2920-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22275835
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
November 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Event Code 4927-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22100366
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Event Code 6739-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 21981954
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 4920-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 21979300
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 4920-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21979295
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY ADDRESS Event Code 8598-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21972037
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Event Code 4930-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 21966021
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Event Code 4927-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21965584
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Event Code 4930-Event Seq 8-Barcode ID 21957845
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Event Code 4930-Event Seq 7-Barcode ID 21957832
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Event Code 4927-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 21957830
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 6729-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 21957825
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Event Code 6739-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 21957819
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Event Code 6739-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 21957788
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
REQUEST Event Code 3016-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21957775
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Event Code 4930-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 21957792
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Event Code 4927-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21957757
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 6729-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 21844904
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Event Code 4930-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 21844918
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Event Code 6739-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21844897
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE Event Code 6859-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21809295
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT Event Code 6938-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20765873
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Event Code 4962-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20742451
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Event Code 4962-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20751557
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT Event Code 6938-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20657792
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER EXTENDING TIME Event Code 6261-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20476117
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO EXTEND TIME Event Code 2945-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20436657
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION Event Code 9740-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION Event Code 9740-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20420093
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 9-Barcode ID 20403309
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 12
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 11-Barcode ID 20403331
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 10
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 20403263
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 13-Barcode ID 20403413
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 8
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 7
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20399255
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 4
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 14
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 20403178
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 5
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20399228
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
PMT: REFUND Event Code 1916-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Event Code 6838-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20361903
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Event Code 4949-Event Seq 4
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Event Code 4949-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20340590
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Event Code 4949-Event Seq 3
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Event Code 4949-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Event Code 6720-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20318370
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Event Code 6700-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20318471
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 6
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 4
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 7
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 5
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 8
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 3
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 2561-Event Seq 10-Barcode ID 20256583
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
MORTGAGE CLAIM AMOUNT WORKSHEET Event Code 1417-Event Seq 11-Barcode ID 20256585
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT OR PETITION Event Code 2835-Event Seq 9-Barcode ID 20256582
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: INDEX RECORDING NAMES > 4 Event Code 1662-Event Seq 5
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS Event Code 9566-Event Seq 6
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM:FCL >50,000 < 250,000 Event Code 1310-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL FILING UPDATED Event Code 2800-Event Seq 7
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: CIRCUIT ADDITIONAL DEFS Event Code 46-Event Seq 4
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: LIS PENDENS - ADDTL PAGE Event Code 2587-Event Seq 3
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: LIS PENDENS - FIRST PAGE Event Code 2585-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
COVER SHEET Event Code 6507-Event Seq 8-Barcode ID 20256581
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |