Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
FEDERAL VS WARREN STUMES
On December 14, 2012 a fcl-non-homestd 50001-249999 case was filed in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL. Judge GEORGE W. MAXWELL III presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 14, 2012
Last Refreshed
February 22, 2021
Filing Location
Brevard County, FL
Category
FCL-NON-HOMESTD 50001-249999
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Judgment of Foreclosure
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE >$50,000 AND <$250,000 RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 1486-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 21285363
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
May 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 3
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
May 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Event Code 6722-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21285243
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
May 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
May 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARING HEARD Event Code 4407-Event Seq 2
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
May 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE Event Code 11567-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21095904
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
March 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20643466
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
February 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Event Code 3004-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20481307
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
February 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE CHANGING LAW FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS Event Code 6914-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20472714
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
February 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS Event Code 6670-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 20474297
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
February 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT Event Code 5134-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 20474212
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
February 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Event Code 2931-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20474211
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
February 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK Event Code 2920-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20472676
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
January 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20305683
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
December 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
FORM A (FORECLOSURE) Event Code 1230-Event Seq 9-Barcode ID 20218201
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
MORTGAGE CLAIM AMOUNT WORKSHEET Event Code 1417-Event Seq 8-Barcode ID 20218200
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT OR PETITION Event Code 2835-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 20218198
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 2561-Event Seq 7-Barcode ID 20218199
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
COVER SHEET Event Code 6507-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 20218197
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL FILING UPDATED Event Code 2800-Event Seq 4
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS Event Code 9566-Event Seq 3
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM:FCL >50,000 < 250,000 Event Code 1310-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: LIS PENDENS - FIRST PAGE Event Code 2585-Event Seq 2
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |