Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
US BANK VS DENNIS SOUKUP
On October 12, 2012 a fcl-homestead $50001-$249999 case was filed in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL. Judge ROBERT T BURGER presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 12, 2012
Last Refreshed
February 22, 2021
Filing Location
Brevard County, FL
Category
FCL-HOMESTEAD $50001-$249999
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Dismissal
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Event Code 6722-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20317111
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
January 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6229-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20317110
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
January 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 3
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL Event Code 5972-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20189391
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
December 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL Event Code 6745-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20179511
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 20162528
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 20162502
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 7-Barcode ID 20162543
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20160674
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 20160692
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20160642
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 20162475
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
November 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE Event Code 4921-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20137164
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
November 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Event Code 4949-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20040344
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
October 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 7
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
October 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 1
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
October 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 4
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
October 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 6
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
October 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 2
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
October 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 5
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
October 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 3
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
MORTGAGE CLAIM AMOUNT WORKSHEET Event Code 1417-Event Seq 10-Barcode ID 19943183
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES Event Code 5739-Event Seq 11-Barcode ID 19943184
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT OR PETITION Event Code 2835-Event Seq 8-Barcode ID 19943176
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 2561-Event Seq 9-Barcode ID 19943181
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: LIS PENDENS - FIRST PAGE Event Code 2585-Event Seq 2
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: CIRCUIT ADDITIONAL DEFS Event Code 46-Event Seq 3
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM:FCL >50,000 < 250,000 Event Code 1310-Event Seq 1
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
COVER SHEET Event Code 6507-Event Seq 7-Barcode ID 19943174
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL FILING UPDATED Event Code 2800-Event Seq 6
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: INDEX RECORDING NAMES > 4 Event Code 1662-Event Seq 5
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS Event Code 9566-Event Seq 4
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |