Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
SUNTRUST VS KRISTEN J DEMERS
On June 26, 2012 a fcl-homestead $50001-$249999 case was filed in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL. Judge J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 26, 2012
Last Refreshed
February 22, 2021
Filing Location
Brevard County, FL
Category
FCL-HOMESTEAD $50001-$249999
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Non-Jury Verdict
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Event Code 5131-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21515533
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
July 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENTS Event Code 5130-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 21515537
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
ASM: JUDICIAL SALE FORECLOSURE Event Code 51-Event Seq 4
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
FORECLOSURE BID SHEET Event Code 10020-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 21412839
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
CAL:FORECLOSURE SALE Event Code 3948-Event Seq 1
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
CR: JUDICIAL SALE HELD Event Code 4644-Event Seq 2
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE Event Code 5132-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 21412369
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
June 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION REGARDING NOTICE OF SALE Event Code 7715-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21348766
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
June 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED Event Code 6143-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21318022
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
June 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
ASSIGNMENT OF BID Event Code 6846-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21342752
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
June 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE Event Code 6740-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21334378
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
May 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE >$50,000 AND <$250,000 RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 1486-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 21268243
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
May 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 6
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
May 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
WITNESS TESTIMONY LOG Event Code 7422-Event Seq 7-Barcode ID 21281422
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
May 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Event Code 6722-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 21268245
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
May 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
CAL:NON JURY TRIAL Event Code 3902-Event Seq 1
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
May 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
FORECLOSURE COVERSHEET WITH LOAN DOCUMENTS Event Code 10124-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 21267144
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
May 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
CR: NON JURY TRIAL CONDUCTED Event Code 4394-Event Seq 3
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
May 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
WITNESS LIST Event Code 6841-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21173354
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
May 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT Event Code 6938-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21074052
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK Event Code 2920-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21054083
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
April 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO VACATE Event Code 2964-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20747271
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
April 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Event Code 6720-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20747273
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
April 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST Event Code 6930-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20736974
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
April 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO VACATE Event Code 6340-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20728789
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
April 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Event Code 6720-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20712626
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
April 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO VACATE Event Code 2964-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20723847
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
March 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF NON JURY TRIAL Event Code 6272-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20644506
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
March 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED Event Code 6143-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20628594
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
March 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Event Code 3004-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20628598
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK Event Code 2920-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20609004
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
December 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Event Code 3004-Event Seq 2
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
December 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Event Code 3004-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20171718
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE AND/OR MORTGAGE Event Code 6770-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20173921
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT Event Code 6938-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20153861
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF PARTY RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 4304-Event Seq 11
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF PARTY RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 4304-Event Seq 9-Barcode ID 20146566
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF PARTY RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 4304-Event Seq 13
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF PARTY RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 4304-Event Seq 12
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF PARTY RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 4304-Event Seq 10
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Event Code 2922-Event Seq 7-Barcode ID 20146218
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK Event Code 2920-Event Seq 8-Barcode ID 20146233
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE Event Code 11567-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 20145336
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE CHANGING LAW FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS Event Code 6914-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 20146211
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT Event Code 6938-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 20145321
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT Event Code 6938-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20145308
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE Event Code 11567-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 20145317
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE CHANGING LAW FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS Event Code 6914-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20143397
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
August 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES Event Code 5739-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19745120
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
July 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 19523336
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
July 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19520376
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
July 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 7-Barcode ID 19523343
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
July 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 19520393
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
July 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 19523320
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
July 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 19523328
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
July 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 6
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
July 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Event Code 4949-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19516222
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
July 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: LIS PENDENS - FIRST PAGE Event Code 2585-Event Seq 18
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 14
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 12
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
MORTGAGE CLAIM AMOUNT WORKSHEET Event Code 1417-Event Seq 10-Barcode ID 19441435
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: INDEX RECORDING NAMES > 4 Event Code 1662-Event Seq 26
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT OR PETITION Event Code 2835-Event Seq 8-Barcode ID 19441432
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS Event Code 9566-Event Seq 24
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: INDEX RECORDING NAMES > 4 Event Code 1662-Event Seq 21
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM:FCL >50,000 < 250,000 Event Code 1310-Event Seq 22
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 15
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: CIRCUIT ADDITIONAL DEFS Event Code 46-Event Seq 20
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 16
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: CIRCUIT ADDITIONAL DEFS Event Code 46-Event Seq 25
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM:FCL >50,000 < 250,000 Event Code 1310-Event Seq 17
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS Event Code 9566-Event Seq 19
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: LIS PENDENS - FIRST PAGE Event Code 2585-Event Seq 23
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 11
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 2561-Event Seq 9-Barcode ID 19441434
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 13
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: LIS PENDENS - FIRST PAGE Event Code 2585-Event Seq 2
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL FILING UPDATED Event Code 2800-Event Seq 6
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM:FCL >50,000 < 250,000 Event Code 1310-Event Seq 1
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: CIRCUIT ADDITIONAL DEFS Event Code 46-Event Seq 4
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: INDEX RECORDING NAMES > 4 Event Code 1662-Event Seq 5
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS Event Code 9566-Event Seq 3
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
COVER SHEET Event Code 6507-Event Seq 7-Barcode ID 19441431
Judge: J. PRESTON SILVERNAIL |