Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
JPMORGAN CHASE VS V HINES
On October 12, 2012 a fcl-homestead $250000 & > case was filed in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL. Judge LISA DAVIDSON presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 12, 2012
Last Refreshed
February 22, 2021
Filing Location
Brevard County, FL
Category
FCL-HOMESTEAD $250000 & >
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Active
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENTS Event Code 5130-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23979539
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Event Code 5131-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 23979542
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
ASSIGNMENT OF BID Event Code 6846-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 23931956
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
ASSIGNMENT OF BID Event Code 6846-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23928660
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
ASM: JUDICIAL SALE FORECLOSURE Event Code 51-Event Seq 5
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
CAL:FORECLOSURE SALE Event Code 3948-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
CR: JUDICIAL SALE HELD Event Code 4644-Event Seq 3
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
FORECLOSURE BID SHEET Event Code 10020-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 23762958
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
ALL REOPEN COMPL EVENTS CLOSED Event Code 3579-Event Seq 6
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE Event Code 5132-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 23763670
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION REGARDING NOTICE OF SALE Event Code 7715-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23708813
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
November 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF OBJECTION Event Code 6920-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23663895
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
November 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
REOPEN FILING UPDATED Event Code 2802-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
November 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE Event Code 6740-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23636973
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
November 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE $250,000 OR GREATER RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 1489-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23604479
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
November 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Event Code 6722-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 23604482
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
November 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 3
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE AND/OR MORTGAGE Event Code 6770-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23266860
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Event Code 6720-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23238289
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENT Event Code 11517-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23182517
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL Event Code 6475-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23195900
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
CAL:NON JURY TRIAL Event Code 3902-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
August 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
CR: NON JURY TRIAL CONT BY CT Event Code 4210-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST Event Code 6930-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23115661
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS Event Code 5125-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23078439
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST Event Code 6930-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 23078440
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
June 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NON-JURY TRIAL Event Code 6818-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22905523
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NON-JURY TRIAL Event Code 6818-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22896388
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF NON JURY TRIAL Event Code 6272-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22891000
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL Event Code 6475-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22872258
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
CR: NON JURY TRIAL CONT BY CT Event Code 4210-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
CAL:NON JURY TRIAL Event Code 3902-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 4920-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 22865776
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES Event Code 6737-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22865775
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF OBJECTION Event Code 6920-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22860908
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST Event Code 6930-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22818373
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
May 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS Event Code 5125-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 22818443
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 4920-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22733453
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 6729-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 22708906
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Event Code 6838-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 22708907
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Event Code 6739-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22708905
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Event Code 4927-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22697956
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 4920-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 22694467
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF NON JURY TRIAL Event Code 6272-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22691952
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NON-JURY TRIAL Event Code 6818-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22674017
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
CAL:CASE MGMNT CONFERENCE Event Code 6075-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARD Event Code 4412-Event Seq 4
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
CAL:CASE MGMNT CONFERENCE Event Code 6075-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARD Event Code 4412-Event Seq 5
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CASE SET FOR TRIAL Event Code 4652-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 22670056
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Event Code 6838-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 22664827
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER EXTENDING TIME Event Code 6261-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22604872
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION Event Code 9740-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22571245
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENT Event Code 11517-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22537033
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Event Code 9883-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22526519
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
CR: CASE MGMNT CONF CONT BY CT Event Code 5737-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER Event Code 4769-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 22515893
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
CAL:CASE MGMNT CONFERENCE Event Code 6075-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Event Code 4930-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 22504991
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 6729-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 22504989
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Event Code 6739-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22504988
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENT Event Code 11517-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22466245
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENT Event Code 11517-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22459531
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Event Code 9883-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22458913
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Event Code 4927-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22256713
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Event Code 4962-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22222714
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
September 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Event Code 6924-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21748618
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE CHANGING LAW FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS Event Code 6914-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20849513
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 6729-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 20821319
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Event Code 4930-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20821276
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Event Code 6739-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20821298
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER Event Code 6322-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 20610270
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Event Code 4949-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20602729
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARING HEARD Event Code 4407-Event Seq 3
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
March 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER EXTENDING TIME Event Code 6261-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20513698
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENT Event Code 11517-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20509722
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER EXTENDING TIME Event Code 6261-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20481164
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO EXTEND TIME Event Code 2945-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20457008
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES Event Code 5739-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20457007
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Event Code 6838-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20248784
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20191389
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Event Code 6838-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 20182817
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Event Code 6700-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20182758
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Event Code 4949-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20176155
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
CAL:ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Event Code 3927-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
December 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
CR:ORD TO SHOW CAUSE CANCELLED Event Code 4311-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
November 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 20127704
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
November 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20123205
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
November 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 20127698
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
November 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20127695
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
November 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE Event Code 6368-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20117180
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
November 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE Event Code 2914-Event Seq 3
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
November 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE Event Code 2914-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
November 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE Event Code 2914-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20061543
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Event Code 6243-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20013961
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Event Code 2902-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20013925
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 5
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 4
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 3
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 2561-Event Seq 11-Barcode ID 19943594
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS OR AMOUNT DUE Event Code 5183-Event Seq 13-Barcode ID 19943619
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT OR PETITION Event Code 2835-Event Seq 10-Barcode ID 19943560
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES Event Code 5739-Event Seq 14-Barcode ID 19943632
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
MORTGAGE CLAIM AMOUNT WORKSHEET Event Code 1417-Event Seq 12-Barcode ID 19943604
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: LIS PENDENS - ADDTL PAGE Event Code 2587-Event Seq 5
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: LIS PENDENS - FIRST PAGE Event Code 2585-Event Seq 4
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
COVER SHEET Event Code 6507-Event Seq 9-Barcode ID 19943549
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS Event Code 9566-Event Seq 6
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL FILING UPDATED Event Code 2800-Event Seq 7
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: CIRCUIT ADDITIONAL DEFS Event Code 46-Event Seq 3
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: INDEX RECORDING NAMES > 4 Event Code 1662-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: FORECLOSURE $250,000 & > Event Code 1331-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |