Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CITIMORTGAGE VS RYAN M GILL
On June 18, 2012 a fcl-homestead $50001-$249999 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL. Judge GEORGE W. MAXWELL III presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 18, 2012
Last Refreshed
February 22, 2021
Filing Location
Brevard County, FL
Category
FCL-HOMESTEAD $50001-$249999
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6229-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21266645
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
May 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Event Code 6722-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 21266757
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
May 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6229-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 21239917
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
May 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 3
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
May 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Event Code 6722-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21239915
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
November 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Event Code 6720-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20154962
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
September 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6734-Event Seq 5
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
September 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6734-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 19853227
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
September 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Event Code 4962-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19838253
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
September 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6734-Event Seq 3
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
September 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6734-Event Seq 4
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
August 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO EXTEND TIME Event Code 2945-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19770677
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
August 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Event Code 4949-Event Seq 2
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
August 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Event Code 4949-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19693382
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
July 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO EXTEND TIME Event Code 2945-Event Seq 2
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
July 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO EXTEND TIME Event Code 2945-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19525692
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
July 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Event Code 6700-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19498226
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
June 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 19450411
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
June 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 19450424
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
June 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 19452142
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
June 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 19450430
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
June 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 19452001
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
June 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19450402
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
June 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 6
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
June 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 4
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
June 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
June 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 5
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
June 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 3
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
June 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 2
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
June 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT OR PETITION Event Code 2835-Event Seq 8-Barcode ID 19407006
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
June 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 2561-Event Seq 9-Barcode ID 19407007
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
June 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
MORTGAGE CLAIM AMOUNT WORKSHEET Event Code 1417-Event Seq 10-Barcode ID 19407008
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
June 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS Event Code 9566-Event Seq 4
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
June 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM:FCL >50,000 < 250,000 Event Code 1310-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
June 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: CIRCUIT ADDITIONAL DEFS Event Code 46-Event Seq 5
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
June 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: LIS PENDENS - ADDTL PAGE Event Code 2587-Event Seq 3
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
June 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL FILING UPDATED Event Code 2800-Event Seq 6
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
June 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: LIS PENDENS - FIRST PAGE Event Code 2585-Event Seq 2
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
June 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
COVER SHEET Event Code 6507-Event Seq 7-Barcode ID 19407003
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |